Harris v. King County et al
Plaintiff: Daprei Harris
Defendant: King County, King County Jail and Benjamin Sanders
Case Number: 2:2016cv01793
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting the 34 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendants' 23 motion for summary judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims against defendants with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND ORDER RE-NOTING Defendants' 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment; Noting Date is 8/18/2017, signed by Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) Modified on 7/31/2017: copy sent to plaintiff via the U.S. Mail (PM).
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE-NOTING defendants' 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Noting Date 7/28/2017 and directing plaintiff to file a response by 7/28/17 with the court by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (RS) cc plaintiff
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Request for Issuance of Subpoena; re 21 Request for Subpoena filed by Daprei Harris. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (swt)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(RS) cc plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. King County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daprei Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?