Peel Technologies, Inc. v. HTC Corporation
Plaintiff: Peel Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01795
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 40 Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Stipulated Motion to reschedule the status conference. Status Conference is continued to 11/21/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINTE ORDER granting parties' 30 stipulated motion to continue status conference. The Status Conference is CONTINUED to 7/25/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Stipulated Motion to continue status conf; Status Conference continued to 6/13/2017 at 09:00 AM by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peel Technologies, Inc. v. HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peel Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Daryl M. Crone(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Gavin William Skok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?