Green v. Swedish Health Services
Plaintiff: Joel Green
Defendant: Swedish Health Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv01861
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 13 Stipulation for Dismissal; Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), this stipulation is self-executing, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 11 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline; Mediation deadline is EXTENDED to 8/1/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 8 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Swedish Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Green
Represented By: Aaron Vincent Rocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swedish Health Services
Represented By: Ryan Paul Hammond
Represented By: Vanessa B.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?