Dahlstrom v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Raju A.T. Dahlstrom
Defendant: United States of America, Norma Ann Joseph, Kevin Joseph Lenon, Thomas Lee DeCoteau, Karen Risamarie Misanes, Patrick Owen Roberts, Jr., Ronda Kaye Metcalf, Cammie Carrigan, Christine Banks, George Bailey, Jack Warren Fiander, Anne M. Crail (MacKoelyn), Robert Larry Morlock, Christine Marie Jody Morlock, Susan Harriet Yurchak and Richard McDonnell
Case Number: 2:2016cv01874
Filed: December 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 118 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting Defendant's 98 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 112 Motion for Revision. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Plaintiff's 103 Response to Motion: Plaintiff shall immediately deliver a paper copy of the opposition and all supporting documents. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER extending the Dispositive motions deadline to 6/18/2019 per parties' 96 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying plaintiff's 93 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting Individual Defendants' 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against the Individual Defendants are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Richard A McDonnell, Ronda Kaye Metcalf, Christine Marie Jody Morlock, Robert Larry Morlock, Susan Harriet Yurchak, George Bailey and Norma Ann Joseph terminated.)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER LIFTING STAY re: 90 notice of appropriations. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings Due to Lapse in Appropriations re parties' 87 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part United States' 68 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying as moot defendant Ronda Kaye's 61 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part United States' 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint; Case STAYED for thirty days ; RENOTING Defendant Ronda Metcalf's 61 MOTION to Dismiss : Noting Date 4/6/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying plaintiff's 57 Motion to Continue Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend initial scheduling dates re parties' 53 Joint Response to Order to Show Cause: initial scheduling dates are extended for 60 days from the date of this Order; VACATING 52 , 51 Order to Show Cause, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to file their Joint Status Report and show cause to the Court by 1/5/2018 why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the Order of September 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 39 Motion for a Rule 56(d) Continuance, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time re parties' 35 Stipulated Motion; United States of America responsive pleading to complaint due 9/1/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Initial Pleadings re parties' 31 Stipulated Motion to Amend, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint.)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline for all defendants to file responsive pleadings; deadline extended to 7/31/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 20 Stipulated Motion; Initial scheduling dates are extended as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/27/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/17/2017, Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re parties' 17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; deadline for United States of America to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is 7/17/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahlstrom v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raju A.T. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Richard Lamar Pope, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Ann Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Joseph Lenon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lee DeCoteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Risamarie Misanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Owen Roberts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Kaye Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cammie Carrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Warren Fiander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M. Crail (MacKoelyn)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Larry Morlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Marie Jody Morlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Harriet Yurchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?