Chen et al v. The City of Redmond, et al
Plaintiff: Susan Chen and Naixiang Lian
Defendant: Natalie D'Amico
Case Number: 2:2016cv01877
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting Michael David Myers' 278 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Myers is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Naixian Lian. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs Chen and Lian
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting Defendants Washington State Department of Social and Health Services (DSHS) and Kimberly Danner's 253 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration. The court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of State Defendants on Plaintiffs' remaining claim for negligent investigation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting Defendant's 253 Motion for Partial Reconsideration; granting summary judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs' remaining claims in this case, and VACATING the trial date. A written order setting forth the court's analysis will follow. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 253 State Defendants' Anticipated Scope of Trial (construed as a motion for reconsideration). Plaintiffs directed to file a response by Wednesday, 1/8/2020, at 12:00 p.m. Seattle time. Defendants' reply due Thursday, 1/9/2020. Clerk directed to note Defendants' 253 MOTION for Reconsideration for 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re: parties' 245 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Proposed Agreed Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the State Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 189 ); GRANTS summary judgment in full in favor of Defendants Bill Moss and Jill Kegel; GRANTS summary judgment in favor of Defendants Kimberly Danner and Washington State Department of Social and Health Services with the exception of Count IX: Negligent Investigation; GRANTS in part and DENIES in part State Defendants' motion to strike p ortions of Plaintiffs' declarations; GRANTS Ms. Chen's and Mr. Lian's motions to file surreplies (Dkt. ## 221 , 223 ); and ORDERS Ms. Chen and Mr. Lian to file the surreplies found at docket numbers 221 -1 and 223 -3 on the docket within seven (7) days of the date of this order. (PM) (Main Document 242 replaced on 12/20/2019) (PM). Modified on 12/20/2019 to identify as Amended (PM). Modified on 12/20/2019 to add additional text to entry per direction of chambers (PM).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER re: Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F. The parties are ORDERED to submit to Judge Creatura's chambers, but not file, a settlement memorandum no later than 4:30 p.m., Tuesday, November 12th. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SWT)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Appoint Settlement Judge re parties' 195 Stipulated Motion. This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Richard J. Creatura, who is hereby appointed to act solely as a settlement judge for a judicial settlement conference, which shall be held no later than 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss Individual State Defendant Tom Soule re parties' 187 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Tom Soule terminated.)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER to dismiss Individual State Defendants Kevin Quigley and Timothy Earwood re parties' 184 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Timothy Earwood and Kevin W. Quigley terminated.)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend discovery completion date re parties' 182 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying Plaintiff Susan Chen's 171 Motion for Reconsideration; denying Plaintiff Naixiang Lian's 172 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER directing Defendants City of Redmond and Natalie D'Amico to respond to Plaintiffs' motions for reconsideration by no later than 6/21/2019. Replies, if any, shall be filed by no later than 6/28/2019. Plaintiffs' 171 , 172 MOTIONS for Reconsideration RENOTED to 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting City Defendants' 106 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Susan Chen; granting in part, denying in part and denying as moot in part City Defendants' 108 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Naixing Lian, J.L., and L.L.; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 141 Motion for Summary Judgment against City Defendants. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting City Defendants' 164 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Dkt. 168 may be filed under seal)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting Plaintiff Susan Chen's 154 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) Dkts. 161 , 157 , and 159 may be filed under seal.
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting Plaintiff Naixiang Lian's 149 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting Susan Chen's 147 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 125 Motion to Seal. Exhibit A to the Declaration of Twyla Caarter (Dkt. No. 128 ), Exhibits A - D to the Declaration of John A. Green, M.D. (Dkt. No. 130 ), and Exhibits B - M, R, and S to the Declaration of T. Augustine Lo (Dkt. No. 133 ) may be filed under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting City Defendants' 105 Motion to Seal. Dkts. 113 , 114 may be filed under seal. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Stipulated Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs must file and serve the amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part City Defendants' 79 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend as described in this order. The court also DENIES as moot City Defendants' previously filed motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 66 ). Plaintiffs must file their amended complaint, if any, no later than twenty (20) days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MODEL AGREEMENT RE: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Order re parties' 86 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 58 Motion for Leave to Amend signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Appointing Litigation Guardian Ad Litem re Plaintiff Naixiang Lian's 56 Petition for Appointment of Litigation of Guardian Ad Litem, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' 57 Motion to clarify the court's 10/16/2017 order. The court CLARIFIES that its ruling extended only to striking Plaintiffs' allegations and claims against the City and to Paragraph 23 of the complaint as to a ll defendants. (See 10/16/17 Order at 4 (noting that Plaintiffs amended their complaint as of right against other defendants), 5; Mot. at 4-5.) The court's clarification is without prejudice, however, to any other defendant raising any issues with the operative complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/6/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2017, Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 10/17/2017: copy to Naixiang Lian via first class mail (PM).
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Defendant City of Redmond's 33 Motion to strike Plaintiffs' amended complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Naixiang Lian via first class mail
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for answers to amended complaint. Defendants' Redmond Police Dept., Ron Gibson and Kristi Wilson's answer due 14 days after ruling on motion to strike. Defendant Natalie D'Amico's answer due no earlier than 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 10/10/2017: copy to Naixiang Lian (PM).
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Defendant City of Redmond's 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint. Defendant City of Redmond's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is not due until fourteen days after the Court issues a ruling on Defendant City of Redmond's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff Naixiang Lian via U.S. Mail)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion to extend case deadlines. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/16/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/23/2017, Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 8/15/2017: copy to Naixiang Lian via the U.S. Mail (PM).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND EXTEND CASE DEADLINES by Judge James L. Robart. Case is consolidated with C17-569 JLR. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/22/2017, Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2017. (PM) cc: plaintiff Lian via the U.S. Mail
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be consolidated with Chen, et al. v. The City of Redmond, No. C17-0569JLR; Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2017, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff Naixiang Lian via USPS)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing Clerk to identify counsel from the Pro Bono Panel by 6/30/2017 who is willing to represent Ms. Chen in this action. Clerk is directed to renote Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel for 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Sharon Haas; Plaintiff via the USPS
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO SCREENING COMMITTEE re Plaintiff Susan Chen's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ms. Chen's 10 motion is renoted for 5/8/2017. The court denies Plaintiffs' 8 Joint Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: S. Haas, cc: Plaintiffs via the USPS
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Plaintiffs' 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiffs directed to file a financial affidavit within 14 days. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs with 2 blank financial affidavit forms
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen et al v. The City of Redmond, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naixiang Lian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?