Goss v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann-Marie Goss
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01888
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION - by Judge J Richard Creatura. (SH) Modified on 6/21/2017 to indicate copy mailed to pro se plaintiff on this date. (SH)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - by Judge J. Richard Creatura. Plaintiff is to file an Opening Brief or Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution by 6/2/2017. (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)(SH)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE: The Clerk shall effectuate service electronically as detailed in General Orders 04-15 and 05-15, by sending a copy of the summonses and complaint by email to USAWAW.SSAClerk@usdoj.gov., signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann-Marie Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?