Picture Perfect Film Assets, LLC v. The McLaren Art Center et al
Plaintiff: Picture Perfect Film Assets
Defendant: The McLaren Art Center, Carolyn Bell Farrell, D'Airain Corporation, Gordon Arnold and William Moore
Case Number: 2:2016cv01893
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: By 117 Minute Order, the Court granted leave to Brian H. Krikorian to withdraw as counsel of record for plaintiff Picture Perfect Film Assets, and advised plaintiff that it may not proceed pro se and must arrange for substitute counsel to appear on its behalf. More than thirty (30) days have elapsed since the minute order was issued, and no attorney has timely appeared on plaintiff's behalf. This action is therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MINUTE ORDER lifting the stay of this action and returning this matter to the active docket ; granting Brian H. Krikorian and Krikorian Legal PLLC 's 116 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff may not proceed pro se and shall arrange for substitute counsel to appear on its behalf within thirty (30) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney Brian H Krikorian terminated)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER terminating The MacLaren Art Center as defendant re parties' 113 Stipulation; deferring ruling on whether to lift the stay of this action; directing plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, on or before 2/8/2019, why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to file the status report required by 112 Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER deferring ruling on whether the stay of this action should be lifted; directing parties to file, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Minute Order, a Joint Status Report summarizing and providing copies of any decisions issued in the related proceedings by the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, and indicating whether the settlement between plaintiff and MAC was reached before or after such decisions. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are DIRECTED to SHOW CAUSE, on or before November 30, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely file the Joint Status Report required by Minute Order entered July 30, 2018, docket no. 109 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER re: 107 Joint Status Report. Parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report within 14 days after any decision by the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in the related action or by October 5, 2018, whichever occurs earlier. Plaintiff's 108 Motion leave to seek service and/or validation of service on defendants Gordon Arnold and D'Airain Corporation is granted. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's motion to strike the reply declaration of David Spellman (dkt. 83 ; denying defendant The MacLaren Art Center's 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting defendant The MacLaren Art Center's 97 Motion to Sta y. This matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after any decision by the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in the proceeding involving many of the parties to this action, or within fourteen (14) days after the Canadian litigation otherwise resolves, or by July 6, 2018, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER renoting Defendant The MacLaren Art Center's 54 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint to March 30, 2018, and will be considered together with the recently filed alternative motion to stay, docket no. 97 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims against Paddon + Yorke, Inc. pursuant to parties' 95 Stipulation ; striking as moot P+Y's 66 Motion to Dismiss ; striking as moot P+Y's 77 Motion for Clarification ; granting Plaintiff's 88 Motion for Default against William Moore ; Default is ENTERED against William Moore ; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Default against Gordon Arnold ; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 90 Motion for Default against D'Airain Corporation. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Paddon and Yorke, Inc. terminated.)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 72 Stipulated Motion to extend deadline. Defendant The MacLaren Art Center's motion, docket no. 54 , to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint is RENOTED to February 2, 2018. Any reply shall be filed by the new noting date. Plaintiff's "ex parte" motion, docket no. 56 , to strike The MacLaren Art Center's motion to dismiss is STRICKEN. See Local Civil Rule 7(g) ("Requests to strike... submissions of opposing parties shall not b e presented in a separate motion to strike, but shall instead be included in the responsive brief, and will be considered with the underlying motion."). The arguments made in plaintiff's motion to strike will, however, be considered in ruli ng on The MacLaren Art Center's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default, docket no. 63 , is GRANTED, and default is hereby ENTERED against defendant Arnold Schwisberg. Defendant Paddon + Yorke, Inc. (sued as Paddon and Y orke, Inc.) filed both a "response," docket no. 65 , to The MacLaren Art Center's motion to dismiss, and a joinder, docket no. 68 , in such motion. Plaintiff has objected on the ground that the "response" is improper becaus e The MacLaren Art Center's motion to dismiss is not directed at Paddon + Yorke, Inc. and that the joinder is untimely because it was filed on the due date for plaintiff's response to The MacLaren Art Center's motion. See Pla.'s O bjection (docket no. 69 ). Paddon + Yorke, Inc.'s motion to strike, docket no. 71 , which concedes that its "response" was improper, is GRANTED, and such "response," docket no. 65 , is STRICKEN. Paddon + Yorke, Inc.'s untimely joinder, docket no. 68 , is also STRICKEN. The Court notes, however, that Paddon + Yorke, Inc. has filed a separate motion to dismiss, docket no. 66 , which is currently noted for February 9, 2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 51 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Third Amended Complaint; granting plaintiff's 50 Ex Parte Motion for Service via International Mail; directing the Clerk to send summons and Third Amended Complaint (See Order for details). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Defendant The MacLaren Art Center's 36 MOTION for Reconsideration ; Noting Date 9/15/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants The MacLaren Art Center and Carolyn Bell Farrell's 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's claims against Carolyn Bell Farrell are DISMISSE D without prejudice ; If plaintiff wishes to amend its complaint, it shall file a motion, along with a proposed third amended complaint, within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Minute Order ; Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why its claims aga inst defendants DAirain Corporation, Gordon Arnold, and William Moore should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service and prosecute ; Having reviewed the 27 Joint Status Report and in light of the procedural posture of this matter, the Court DECLINES to set a trial date at this time. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with the Order requiring Joint Status Report ( 4 and 13 Minute Orders), Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2017 ; denying Plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Default of William Moore. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picture Perfect Film Assets, LLC v. The McLaren Art Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picture Perfect Film Assets
Represented By: Brian H Krikorian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McLaren Art Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Bell Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Airain Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?