Microsoft Corporation v. The Software King et al
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: The Software King, Bizignition Technologies, Inc., Roger Hardy, Winston Cabell and Nicholas Bozikis
Case Number: 2:2016cv01899
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing this action and all claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion to Extend Trial and Related Dates signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/13/2018; Discovery Motions due by 8/17/2018, Discovery completed by 9/14/2018, Dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/17/2019, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 2/6/2019. (PM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPUALTED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 32 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Joinder of Parties deadline is 11/17/2017, Amended Pleadings deadline is 12/1/2017. All other deadlines in the Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (Dkt. No. 23 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Anthony Todaro of the firm DLA Piper LLP (US) is allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for BizIgnition in the above-captioned case, that he is removed fro m the electronic service list in this case, and that John D. Denkenberger, James W. Anable, and Brian F. McMahon of the firm Christensen O'Connor Johnson Kindness PLLC be substituted as lead counsel for BizIgnition Technologies, Inc., Roger Hardy, and Nicholas Bozikis. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline to 6/30/17 to answer complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint; re parties' 11 Stipulation; Defendants BizIgnition Technologies, Inc. and Roger Hardy will file a response to the Complaint no later than May 4, 2017; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. The Software King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Software King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bizignition Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Bozikis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?