Chenoweth et al v. HMR Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Margarete Chenoweth and David Chenoweth
Defendant: HMR Funding, LLC, Dean Chase, Mark Guedri, MKL Services LLC, CHC Services, LLC and TransAmerica Medical Assistance, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01928
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting Defendant CHC Services' 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (CHC Services, LLC terminated.)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 58 Stipulation; The deadline to join additional parties is EXTENDED to 7/25/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for joining additional parties re parties' 56 Stipulation; Joinder of Parties deadline EXTENDED to 7/11/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 54 Stipulation; MKL Services LLC answer due by 6/30/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 51 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 38 Motion to Dismiss ; Plaintiffs' deadline to file Response EXTENDED to 6/30/2017, CHCS' reply brief due 7/7/2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant MKL Services LLC's Response to Amended Complaint re parties' 49 Stipulation; MKL Services LLC answer due 6/20/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Opposition to 38 Defendant CHC Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss; re parties' 44 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 37 Stipulation for Additional Time to Respond to Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. MKL Services LLC answer due 6/1/2017. This extension does not delay or extend the deadlines in 33 Amended Order. (SWT)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 35 Stipulation for Extension of Time; CHCS shall have until May 1, 2017 to file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report and Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2017. (KERR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant MKL Services LLC's Response to Amended Complaint; re parties' 12 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Deadline for MKL Services LLC to file its Answer to Amended Complaint is extended to 3/31/17. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenoweth et al v. HMR Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarete Chenoweth
Represented By: Kevin P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chenoweth
Represented By: Kevin P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMR Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Guedri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKL Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHC Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAmerica Medical Assistance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?