G.G. et al v. Valve Corporation
Plaintiff: G.G., A.L. and B.S.
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv01941
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re Parties' 61 Stipulated Motion to Strike and Reset Deadlines. All of the deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order (Dkt. # 57 ) are stricken. The Court will reset the deadlines for the parties Rule 26(f) conference, initial disclos ures, and submission of the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan to particular dates that will be determined after the Court rules on Defendant Valve Corporation's pending motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 59 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 54 Amended Motion to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs have seven (7) days from the filing date of this order to file their amended complaint (Dkt. # 54 -1) on the court's docket. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting Defendant's 33 Motion to Lift Stay and Dismiss Case with Prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 34 Motion to seal response in opposition to Defendant's 33 motion to lift stay and dismiss case with prejudice, and exhibits attached thereto. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain Docket Numbers 35 , 35 -1, 35 -2, 35 -3, 35 -4, 35 -5, 35 -6, 35 -7, 35 -8, 35 -9, and 35 -10 under seal. Parties to file publicly-available versions of the documents for which Defendant has withdrawn its designation of Confidential in its response to Plaintiffs' motion to seal. (See Dkt. No. 40 .) Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting defendant's 10 Motion to compel arbitration and staying action pending arbitration by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour granting 21 stipulated motion to seal documents filed with Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to remand. (PM)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 16 stipulated motion regarding pending motions 10 , 12 . Clerk is directed to remove the current noting date on the 10 motion to compel arbitration. If Defendant renotes the motion to compel arbitration, Plaintiff's response due 14 days after the Court's order to remand; Reply due 10 days after Plaintiff's response is filed. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.G. et al v. Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.G.
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.S.
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Charles B Casper(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Sarah E Joye
Represented By: Gavin William Skok
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?