Lil' Man In The Boat Inc v. Auk Ta Shaa Discovery LLC
Plaintiff: Lil' Man In The Boat, Inc
Defendant: Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01943
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STAYING CASE, granting 23 Stipulated Motion to Stay Case pending appeal to the 9th Circuit from the Northern District of California. Upon resolution of the Appeal, the Parties will immediately notify this Court and request the stay be lifted, or if necessary, to dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY by Judge James L. Robart. Plaintiff is directed to show cause within 10 days of this order why the court should not dismiss case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The court strikes Plaintiff's unstipulated 20 Motion to Stay and re-notes the 23 Stipulated Motion to Stay for the same day that Lil' Man's show cause response is due. (PM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER extending the show cause deadline to 2/27/2017. Clerk directed to email a copy of this order and the order to show 7 to Mr. Ongaro at the email address listed on the complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: orders emailed to Mr. Ongaro
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lil' Man In The Boat Inc v. Auk Ta Shaa Discovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lil' Man In The Boat, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?