Patel v. Seattle Genetics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samit Patel
Defendant: Seattle Genetics, Inc., Clay B. Siegall and Todd E. Simpson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00041
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Second Amended Complaint; denying as moot Defendants' 36 Request for Judicial Notice. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulated Motion Regarding Schedule for Briefing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants have until 1/5/2018 to file motion; Response due 2/16/2018; Reply due 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 24 Request for Judicial Notice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Consolidated Amended Compl aint curing the above-mentioned deficiencies no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within this time period will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion re briefing schedule for briefing defendants' motion to dismiss signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 9 Stipulated Motion re schedule for filing consolidated amended complaint and briefing dfts' anticipated motion to dismiss by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel; re 6 Motion to Appoint Carl Johnson as lead plaintiff and approve counsel, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Seattle Genetics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Genetics, Inc.
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay B. Siegall
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd E. Simpson
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samit Patel
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?