Anderson v. Richards et al
Plaintiff: Sean D Anderson
Defendant: Allen K Richards, Seattle Police Department and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2017cv00058
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER adopting the 63 Report and Recommendations; granting Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450) (PM)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying plaintiff's 45 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting plaintiff's 42 Motion to Request Leave of Court for 15 Additional Interrogatories; Discovery deadline extended to 2/12/2018, Dispositive motions deadline extended to 3/5/2018, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline; Discovery completed by 1/26/2018, Dispositive motions due by 2/26/2018, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying without prejudice Interested Party Washington Department of Corrections' 32 Motion to Stay Court's Order, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend Complaint ; Adam D. Beatty is substituted for Alan K. Richards and William F. Anderson is substituted for John Doe ; Defendants Officer Richards and John Doe are dismissed from case with prejudic e ; Answer due 11/3/2017 ; Discovery deadline EXTENDED to 12/22/2017, Dispositive motions deadline EXTENDED to 1/22/2018, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Adam D Beatty and William F Anderson added. John Doe and Allen K Richards terminated.) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Defendant Allen Richards's 24 Motion for Court Order to Make Video CD's Available to Incarcerated Plaintiff, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(SWT)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 21 Motion for Leave to Take Incarcerated Plaintiff's Deposition signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Sean Anderson, Prisoner ID: 957450)(AE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Richards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen K Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?