Caldellis v. Obenland
Petitioner: Noel Caldellis
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Case Number: 2:2017cv00078
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; denying petitioner's 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; issuing a certificate of appealability with respect to grounds one, two, four, five, and six of the petition. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting petitioner's 16 Unopposed Motion to Compel State to Produce and File Trial Transcripts ; RENOTING 10 MOTION/RESPONSE to 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Noting Date 8/25/2017, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Petitioner's 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Petitioners reply is due May 30, 2017; consideration of the habeas petition RENOTED to June 2, 2017, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldellis v. Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noel Caldellis
Represented By: Jeffrey Erwin Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Obenland
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?