Rabang et al v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Margretty Rabang, Olive Oshiro, Dominador Aure, Christina Peato, Elizabeth Oshiro and Michelle Roberts
Defendant: Robert Kelly, Jr, Rick D George, Agripina Smith, Bob Solomon, Lona Johnson, Katherine Canete, Raymond Dodge, Elizabeth King George, Katrice Romero, Donia Edwards and Rickie Armstrong
Case Number: 2:2017cv00088
Filed: January 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying Defendants' 176 Motion to Strike signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re Plaintiffs' response to the Court's order to show cause (Dkt. No. 159 ) and Defendants' responses (Dkt. Nos. 161 , 164 ). The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs' complaint without prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 155 Joint Status Report. The appeal having been resolved, this Court once again has jurisdiction over all claims and parties in this case and LIFTS the stay of proceedings. Plaintiffs shall file a brief that is no longer than 20 double-spaced pages, no later than Friday, June 29, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying Defendants' 144 Motion for an Indicative Ruling Regarding Dismissal. The Kelly Defendants shall notify the Clerk for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals that their motion for indicative ruling (Dkt. No. 144 ) has been DENIED. All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the Court of Appeals' order. The parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court when the Court of Appeals has issued its order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all pending case management dates, including pending motions and trial dates. When the Court lifts its stay, the parties may re-note any pending motions before the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER staying all proceedings until 4/30/2018. Parties ordered to file a joint status report that notifies the Court of any action regarding DOI's issuance of a recognition decision pursuant to the MOA or the status of that decision. The Cl erk is directed to renote Plaintiff's 95 MOTION to Compel, Defendants' 98 MOTION to Quash Subpoena duces tecum, Defendants' 125 MOTION to Strike Notices and for Protective Order, and Objector Nooksack Indian Tribe of WA's 124 MOTION to Quash to 4/30/2018. Defendant Dodge's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment is renoted for 6/15/2018 Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. The Court STAYS all proceedings in this case until January 12, 2018. No later than January 12, 2018, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report that details the results of the Nooksack Tribal Council election and any subsequent acti on taken by the DOI in accordance with the MOA. Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. No. 95 ), Defendants' motion to quash subpoena duces tecum (Dkt. No. 98 ), Defendants motion to strike notices of depositions and for protective order (Dkt . No. 125 ), and Objector Nooksack Indian Tribe of Washington's motion to quash (Dkt. No. 124 ) are RENOTED to January 26, 2018. The Clerk further RENOTES Defendant Dodge's 66 motion for summary judgment to March 9, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER directing parties to provide briefing in response to the Memorandum of Agreement (MOA) entered into on August 25, 2017 by Robert Kelly and Michael Black. Briefs due 10/6/2017. Clerk directed to RENOTE the following: Plaintiffs' [95 ] MOTION to Compel and Defendants' 98 MOTION to Quash Subpoena are renoted for 10/6/2017; Defendant Dodge's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment is renoted for 11/27/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Stipulated Motion for an order restricting publication of evidence on social media. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to RENOTE Defendant Raymond Dodge's 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 11/3/2017, authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 75 MOTION to Continue Defendant Dodge's Motion for Summary Judgment ; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove the noting date on the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 66 ). The parties are ORDERED to provide the Cou rt with the date discovery begins or began. The Court will renote the motion for summary judgment for four months after the start of discovery and set an opposition and reply briefing schedule. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to RENOTE Defendant Dodge's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment to 6/23/2017; Reply to Plaintiffs' opposition due 6/9/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Defendant Raymond Dodge's 30 Motion to Dismiss, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. If Plaintiffs choose to amend their complaint, they must do so within 14 days. If no amendment is filed, the claims will be DISMISSED with prejudice. (SWT)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying plaintiffs' 43 Motion to Continue by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' 37 Motion seeking a remedy for Plaintiffs' improper False Claims Act filing. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabang et al v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margretty Rabang
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olive Oshiro
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominador Aure
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Peato
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Oshiro
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Roberts
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Ryan David Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kelly, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick D George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agripina Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lona Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Canete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth King George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrice Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donia Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickie Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?