Boule v. Egbert et al
Plaintiff: Robert Boule
Defendant: Erik Egbert and Jane Doe Egbert
Case Number: 2:2017cv00106
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting Defendant's 102 (Sealed), 107 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the remainder of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Egbert in their entirety. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 94 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment Claim; granting Defendant Egbert's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment Claim and dismissing the claim against Defendant Egbert in it's entirety. The remainder of Defendant Egbert's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 102 ) remains noted on the Court's calendar and will be resolved by separate Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re: parties' 150 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Certain Claims. IT IS ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED with prejudice under FRCP 41 without an award of fees or costs to any party: Agent Egbert's anti- SLAPP co unterclaim, Mr. Boule's Fourteenth Amendment claim, Mr. Boule's negligence claim, and Mr. Boule's claim for an award of attorney's fees and costs under 42 U.S.C. § 1988 and 28 U.S.C. § 2412(b). Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Anti-SLAPP Counterclaim (Dkt. # 97 ) is STRICKEN AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re: parties' 125 Stipulated Motion Extending Deadline. The deadline for CBP and ICE to pay the attorney's fees and costs ordered in the Court's June 27, 2018 Order is extended from July 27, 2018 to August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Egbert's 90 Supplemental Motion for Fees and Costs. Defendant Egbert is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $10,444.00 and costs in the amount of $63.05, for a total award of $10,507.05. Customs and Border Protection and Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL reimburse Agent Egbert and his insurer in this amount, made payable to Mills Meyers Swartling P.S. In Trust for Erik Egbert no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 80 Motion to Extend Discovery and Trial Dates, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting Defendant's 60 Motion to Compel; granting in part Defendant's 63 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Certain Discovery and Dispositive Motions. The Court shall strike the current trial date of 7/23/2018 and pre-trial deadlines from the discovery deadline forward. Parties to file a Joint Status Report within 14 days. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF MALICIOUS-PROSECUTION COUNTERCLAIM re parties' 75 Stipulated MOTION. IT IS ORDERED that Agent Egbert's counterclaim for malicious prosecution is DISMISSED without an award of fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Defendant's 40 Motion to Compel; granting Defendant's 55 Motion to Allow Certain Discovery After March 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER BETWEEN PARTIES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER ROTECTION AND U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING RELEASE OF INFORMATION directing the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) to disclose the information discussed by the parties in the court hearing held on March 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 19 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MODEL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; re parties' 15 Stipulation, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Scheduling Deadlines; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/29/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2017, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan as Required by FRCP26(f) and Local Civil Rule 26(f)due by 7/12/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting plaintiff's 7 Motion to vacate the Order of Default against defendants Erik and Jane Doe Egbert by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) Modified on 4/17/2017/cc W Scott Railton (RS).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boule v. Egbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boule
Represented By: Breean Lawrence Beggs
Represented By: Gregory Donald Boos
Represented By: W Scott Railton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Egbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Egbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?