DiMaio v. County of Snohomish et al
Plaintiff: Richard DiMaio
Defendant: County of Snohomish and Ty Trenary
Case Number: 2:2017cv00128
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Defendants' 32 Second Motion to Dismiss. The court dismisses Mr. DiMaio's complaint without leave to amend. The court's dismissal is with prejudice as to Mr. DiMaio's constitutional claims but without prejudice as to his breach of contract claim. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 36 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER. The court will not dismiss Mr. DiMaio's case for failure to comply with the court's August 2, 2017, order. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ORDERS Mr. DiMaio to SHOW CAUSE no later than ten (10) days of the date of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the court's August 2, 2017, order (Dkt. # 20 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 8 Motion to dismiss and for a more definite statement. The court DENIES the motion under Rule 12(b)(5) but QUASHES Mr. DiMaio's prior attempt at service and EXTENDS the time for effec ting service of process; GRANTS the motion under Rule 12(b)(6) and DISMISSES Mr. DiMaio's complaint without prejudice and with leave to amend; and DENIES as moot Defendants' motion under Rule 12(e). Mr. DiMaio must file an amended complaint no later than August 22, 2017, and accomplish proper service of process no later than August 31, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: plaintiff via the U.S. Mail
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines. Case schedule shall be amended so as to make deadlines fall within a reasonable amount of time after the court has considered Defendants' motions to dismiss and for a more definite statements. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 5/30/2017: cc to Plaintiff via the USPS (PM).
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for extension to time to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss 8 ; denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss due 5/22/2017; Reply due 5/26/2017. Clerk directed to renote Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss for 5/26/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the USPS
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiMaio v. County of Snohomish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard DiMaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Snohomish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?