Ali et al v. Trump et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, A. F. A., Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali and E. A.
Defendant: Donald Trump, U.S. Department of State, Tom Shannon, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Lori Scialabba, Office of the Director of National Intelligence and Michael Dempsey
Case Number: 2:2017cv00135
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Melissa Crow for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. (Crow, Melissa)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 104 Stipulated Motion/Status Report for extension of stay of proceedings. Parties to file a joint status report within 10 days of the Supreme Court's resolution of the matter in Trump v. Hawaii. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 23, 2018 Filing 105 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 104 Status Report, Stipulated Motion for Extension of Stay of Proceedings (Adams, Matt)
January 18, 2018 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Extend Stay by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Young, Stacey)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting parties' 102 Stipulated Motion to extend the stay of proceedings. The court ORDERS the stay to remain in effect until such time as the Ninth Circuit rules on the appeal of the preliminary injunction in Hawaii v. Trump, No. 17-17168 (9th Cir.). The court further ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report within seven (7) days of such a ruling by the Ninth Circuit or any other event that warrants the court's reconsideration of the stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 31, 2017 Filing 102 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Stay and Status Report, filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. Noting Date 11/14/2017, (Darrow, Joseph)
October 10, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph A. Darrow on behalf of Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Darrow, Joseph)
September 21, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Trina Realmuto. Filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. (Realmuto, Trina) Modified address on 9/21/2017 (DS).
September 21, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Kristin Macleod-Ball. Filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. (Macleod-Ball, Kristin) Modified Address and Firm Association on 9/21/2017 (DS).
July 14, 2017 Filing 98 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Young, Stacey)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; Joint Status Report due by 7/14/2017, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
June 22, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Movant Mikki the Mime, Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/22/2017, (Young, Stacey)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 85 Motion to stay proceedings pending the Ninth Circuit's resolution of the appeal in Hawaii v. Trump. In addition, the court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report within 10 days of the Ninth Circuit's ruling in Hawaii v. Trump so that the court may reevaluate the stay at that time. Because this action is now stayed, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove the pending motions (Dkt. ## 58 , 94 ) from the court's calendar. After the stay is lifted, the parties may renote these motions for the court's consideration if appropriate at that time. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 14, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) Noting Date 5/26/2017, (Young, Stacey)
April 14, 2017 Filing 93 REPLY, filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, Amicus Washington State Labor Council, TO RESPONSE to 85 MOTION to Stay (Young, Stacey)
April 10, 2017 Filing 92 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar, to 85 MOTION to Stay . (Adams, Matt)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 86 motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint and second motion for class certification. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 5, 2017 Filing 90 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Matt Adams, Glenda Aldana Madrid, Malou Chavez; Def Counsel: Stacey Young (appearing by phone); CR: Andrea Ramirez; Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2017 re: Defendants' Opposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Second Motion for Class Certification (Dkt. # 86 ). The court hears argument from counsel. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. Written order to follow. (AD)
April 4, 2017 Filing 89 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar, to 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Second Motion for Class Certification. (Chavez, Maria)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants a short-term extension of time for their responses to Plaintiffs' amended complaint 52 and second motion for class certification 58 through Wednesday, April 5, 2017. The court further schedules a telephone conference for 10:00 a.m., Pacific Daylight Time (PDT), on April 5, 2017, at which time the court will consider Defendants' motion to extend 86 the two deadlines at issue to ten (10) days after the court resolves Defendants' pending motion to stay 85 . Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion for an extension of time is due by 12:00 noon, PDT, on 4/4/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF AMICUS BRIEFS by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Second Motion for Class Certification, filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2017, (Young, Stacey)
March 30, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/14/2017, (Young, Stacey)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting the Washington State Labor Council's 75 Motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion for TRO. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying Mikki the Mime's 60 Motion to Intervene. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by Ms. Mime on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) cc: Mikki the Mime and Joseph A. Camp via the U.S. Mail
March 28, 2017 Filing 82 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar.(Adams, Matt)
March 21, 2017 Filing 81 Summons issued electronically as to defendant Kevin K. McAleenan. (PM)
March 20, 2017 Filing 80 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 52 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER staying Plaintiffs' 53 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and finding as moot Plaintiffs' original 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction related to EO1. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 15, 2017 Filing 78 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Matt Adams, Glenda Aldana Madrid, Maria Lucia Chavez; appearing by phone: Kristin Macleod-Ball, Mary Kenney, Melissa Crow, Trina Realmuto, Aaron Reichlin-Melnick; Def Counsel: Chad Readler, Stacey Young; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2017 The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 53 ). The court takes the matter under advisement; written order to follow. (AD)
March 15, 2017 Filing 77 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief re TRO (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
March 15, 2017 Filing 76 DECLARATION of Jeff Johnson In Support of Motion to File Amicus Brief re Motion for TRO re 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief re TRO by Amicus Washington State Labor Council (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
March 15, 2017 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief re TRO, filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration) Noting Date 3/15/2017, (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
March 15, 2017 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Maria Lucia Chavez filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 15, 2017 Filing 73 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the in-court hearing re: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 53 ) on 3/15/2017 at 2:00 p.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (AD)
March 14, 2017 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 14, 2017 Filing 71 RESPONSE, by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, to 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Young, Stacey)
March 14, 2017 Filing 70 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re 65 Telephone Conference,,, by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Young, Stacey)
March 14, 2017 Filing 69 MINUTE ENTRY at the direction of chambers: The Court hereby orders the Clerk make all the documents in this case, unless sealed by a motion and order, available for remote public access. (AD)
March 14, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: In-court hearing re: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 53 ) is set for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Counsel may appear telephonically. (AD)
March 13, 2017 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Kristin Macleod-Ball filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-Z, # 2 Exhibits AA-RR)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 13, 2017 Filing 67 PRAECIPE re 56 Declaration, by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar (Attachments: # 1 Errata Declaration of Mozhdeh Oskouian in Support of Plaintiffs)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 13, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maria Lucia Chavez on behalf of Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. (Chavez, Maria)
March 13, 2017 Filing 65 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Matt Adams, Mary Kenney, Glenda Aldana Madrid, Trina Realmuto; Def Counsel: Stacey Young, Chad Readler; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. # 9 ). Defendants shall file their brief in response to Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO by 4:30 p.m. PDT on Tuesday, March 14, 2017. Their response shall not exceed 40 pages. Plaintiffs and Defendants are directed to submit briefs of no more than five (5) pages on the availability of injunctive relief on a non-certified class, also by 4:30 p.m. PDT on Tuesday, March 14, 2017. Plaintiffs' first Motion to Certify Class (Dkt. # 3 ) is stricken from the docket. (AD)
March 13, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE ; filed by Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Rex W Tillerson, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Readler, Chad)
March 13, 2017 Filing 63 Summons Issued electronically as to defendant Customs and Border Protection, (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Jeff B. Sessions) (PM)
March 13, 2017 Party Rex W Tillerson added as a defendant and Party Tom Shannon (Acting Secretary of State) terminated per 52 Amended Complaint. (PM)
March 10, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chad A. Readler on behalf of Defendants Customs and Border Protection, Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Jefferson B. Sessions, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Readler, Chad)
March 10, 2017 Filing 61 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 52 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 10, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant Mikki the Mime. (filing pro se) (swt)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER scheduling a telephone conference for 3/13/2017 at 09:00 AM, PDT, in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart regarding a schedule for Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction,(Dkt. 53 ) and a hearing on the motion. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 10, 2017 Filing 58 Second MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2017, (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 10, 2017 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Joanna Fischer filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Adams, Matt)
March 10, 2017 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Mozhdeh Oskouian filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Adams, Matt)
March 10, 2017 Filing 55 DECLARATION of Olad Issa Omar filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Adams, Matt)
March 10, 2017 Filing 54 Second DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar re 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Adams, Matt)
March 10, 2017 Filing 53 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., Seyedehfatemeh Hamedani, Jaffer Akhlaq Hussain, F. O. I., S. O. I., Faduma Olad Issa, Olad Issa Omar. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/10/2017, (Adams, Matt)
March 10, 2017 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Reema Khaled Dahman, A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, G. E..(Adams, Matt)
March 7, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE ; filed by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Young, Stacey)
March 3, 2017 Filing 50 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., TO RESPONSE to 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart granting Defendants' 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' 3 MOTION for Class Certification. Response due 3/20/2017; Reply due 3/24/2017. (PM)
March 2, 2017 Filing 48 REPLY, filed by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, TO RESPONSE to 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Young, Stacey)
February 28, 2017 Filing 47 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E., to 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 43 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aaron Reichlin-Melnick for A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, and G. E., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re 42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa Crow for A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman,and G. E., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 41 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mary Kenney for defendants A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, and G. E., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 28, 2017 Filing 43 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aaron Reichlin-Melnick FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4785666 (Adams, Matt)
February 28, 2017 Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa Crow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4785658 (Adams, Matt)
February 28, 2017 Filing 41 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mary Kenney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4785647 (Adams, Matt)
February 27, 2017 Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, to 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. (Young, Stacey)
February 23, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, filed by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/3/2017, (Young, Stacey)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/7/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/21/2017. (AD)
February 17, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 3 MOTION to Certify Class . Filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E.. Noting Date 3/10/2017, (Chavez, Maria)
February 17, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re 35 MOTION to Stay Briefing Deadlines ; by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Young, Stacey)
February 16, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Briefing Deadlines, filed by Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/24/2017, (Young, Stacey)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying Plaintiffs' 31 Motion to synchronize briefing schedule. Parties ordered to proceed with briefing Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's Local Civil Rules. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65; Local Rules W.D. Wash. LCR 7(d)(3). (PM)
February 10, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stacey I Young on behalf of Defendants Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Young, Stacey)
February 9, 2017 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 31 MOTION renote and modify the briefing schedule re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 9, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION renote and modify the briefing schedule re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/9/2017, (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 9, 2017 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to various on 2/3/2017, filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E.. (Chavez, Maria)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristin Macleod-Ball for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, and for G. E., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Trina Realmuto for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman and G. E., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 7, 2017 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristin Macleod-Ball FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4760708 (Adams, Matt)
February 7, 2017 Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Trina Realmuto FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4760697 (Adams, Matt)
February 6, 2017 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Deniz UYSAL-FERRE filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Nita Nicole UPADHYE filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Ghassan TAHHAN filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Sohail SOBHANI filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Gregory Howard SISKIND filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Azin SAFARI filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Mohamed Barre OMAR filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Nikoo NIKNEJAD filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jaffer A. HUSSAIN filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Hesam Moazzami FARAHANI filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Carol E. EDWARD filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Reema Khaled DAHMAN filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed ALI filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Elias Mohamud ABDI filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Abdelraziq ADAM filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 6, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/3/2017, (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 3, 2017 Filing 8 Summonses electronically issued as to defendant(s) Michael Dempsey, John Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Lori Scialabba, Tom Shannon, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(CDA)
February 2, 2017 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Melissa Crow filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 2, 2017 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Trina Realmuto filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 2, 2017 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mary Kenney filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 2, 2017 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Matt Adams filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. re 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 2, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement) Noting Date 2/24/2017, (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
February 2, 2017 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs A. F. A., E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, Reema Khaled Dahman, G. E. (Aldana Madrid, Glenda)
January 31, 2017 Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4750904), filed by Reema Khaled Dahman, A. F. A., Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali, E. A., Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali, G. E.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Executive Order, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Matt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juweiya Abdiaziz Ali
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. F. A.
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reema Khaled Dahman
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. E.
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammed Ahmed Ali
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. A.
Represented By: Matt Adams
Represented By: Glenda Melinda Aldana Madrid
Represented By: Melissa Crow(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mary Kenney(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kristin Macleod-Ball(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Trina Realmuto(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Aaron Reichlin-Melnick(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Shannon
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Scialabba
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dempsey
Represented By: Stacey I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?