State of Washington, et al., v. Trump., et al Featured Case

The State of Washington filed a complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief seeking to invalidate President Trump's executive order suspending immigrant and nonimmigrant entry into the United States from certain Muslim countries. The complaint alleged that the executive order violated the Fifth and First Amendments to the United States Constitution, as well as the Immigration and Naturalization Act, the Foreign Affairs Reform and Restructuring Act of 1998, the Religious Freedom Restoration Act and the Administrative Procedure Act.

Plaintiff: State of Washington, State of Oregon, State of California, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts and State of New York
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Rex Tillerson and Elaine C. Duke
Amicus: Americans United for Separation of Church and State, American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU), Service Employees International Union, Law Professors, Washington State Labor Council, Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Harry E. Ries, International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, City of Chicago, New York University and American Center for Law & Justice
Case Number: 2:2017cv00141
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Arjun Garg for Defendants Elaine C. Duke, John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Garg, Arjun)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER denying non-party Rick Satcher's 212 Motion for Reconsideration of the court's order denying him both intervention as of right and permissive intervention in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Rick Satcher via first class mail
February 23, 2018 Filing 213 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Not at this address) re: Motion for Leave to Intervene and copy of 174 Order Denying Motions to Intervene addressed to Rick Satcher. Clerk's note: Mr. Satcher is at Lewis County Jail. Clerk updated address on docket. (PM) Modified on 2/26/2018: documents re-mailed to Mr. Satcher at Lewis County Jail (PM).
February 16, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Movant Rick Satcher. Noted by Clerk for 2/16/2018. Clerk's note: Address updated to address on envelope although it appears as though Mr. Satcher is in Lewis County Jail. (PM)
November 21, 2017 Filing 211 Appeal Remark (17-35105) re 53 Notice of Appeal, Notice from Supreme Court of the United States (17-5424) The Court today entered the following order in the above entitled case: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (SG)
October 27, 2017 Filing 210 NOTICE of Stricken TRO Motion hearing set for 10/30/2017. (AD)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Staying Decision of Plaintiffs' 195 Third Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; The court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove the motion from its calendar, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Filing 208 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Melody, Colleen)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' deadline to respond to the Third Amended Complaint until 14 days after the Court enters an order resolving both Plaintiffs' TRO motion and any subsequent preliminary injunction motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 26, 2017 Filing 206 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Third Amended Complaint by parties (Bennett, Michelle)
October 23, 2017 Filing 205 RESPONSE, by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Bennett, Michelle)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re 203 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert A Scott for Plaintiff State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 19, 2017 Filing 203 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert A. Scott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5059914 (Chien, Marsha)
October 19, 2017 Filing 202 NOTICE of Lodging Additional Declarations re 198 Amended Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Updated Imdex of Declarations in Support of Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Decl of Negin Ingbrigtsen, # 3 2nd Decl of Sadaf Amin, # 4 Decl of Janet Billups, # 5 Decl of Janet Camp, # 6 Decl of Susan Capalbo, # 7 2nd Decl of Margaret Everett, # 8 Decl of Anke Schennink, # 9 2nd Decl of Lovely A. Warren, # 10 Decl of Wim Wiewel, # 11 Decl of Lydia Wood, # 12 Decl of Joseph E. Fahey, # 13 2nd Decl of Aaron O. Lavine, # 14 2nd Decl of Eric Scherzer, # 15 3rd Decl of Eric Scherzer)(Melody, Colleen)
October 19, 2017 Filing 201 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the TRO hearing on 10/30/2017 at 1:30 p.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (AD)
October 17, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 200 Notice: edited text to correct filer's name from State of Minnesota to State of Massachusetts per phone call from counsel. (PM)
October 17, 2017 Filing 200 NOTICE re 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Plaintiffs State of California, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Massachusetts, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Washington. (Chien, Marsha) Modified on 10/17/2017: edited text to correct filer's name per phone call from counsel (PM).
October 16, 2017 Filing 199 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 198 Amended Complaint, filed on 10/16/2017 was improperly signed by Robert A. Scott, Meghan K. Casey, and Anisha Dasgupta. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." cc to counsel via ad hoc e-mail(KB)
October 16, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 198 Amended Complaint, : Modified docket text to include all filers' names on 10/16/2017 (SWT). (SWT)
October 16, 2017 Filing 198 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Washington, State of California, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of New York, State of Oregon.(Chien, Marsha) Modified docket text to include all filers' names on 10/16/2017 (SWT).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 193 Motion to Lift the Stay; granting the States' 194 Motion to amend the complaint. The court orders the States to file their proposed third amended complaint within 5 days of this order. The court schedules a hearing on Monday, October 30, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. PDT before Judge James L. Robart on the States' 195 Motion for Temporary Restraining. Briefing schedule for the States' motion for TRO is as follows: Defendants' response due 10/23/2017, at 12:00 noon PDT; States' reply due 10/26/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 12, 2017 Filing 196 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 11, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
October 11, 2017 Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint 3rd Amended, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Index of Declarations, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Decl of Joint Former National Security Officials, # 19 Decl of Nima Ala, # 20 2nd Decl of Rabyaah Althaibani, # 21 Decl of Alireza Ayoubi, # 22 Decl of Shervin Beygi, # 23 Decl of Bahareh Bina, # 24 Decl of Ethan Devenport, # 25 Decl of Yasaman Esmaili, # 26 Decl of Mahdi Hajiaghayi, # 27 Decl of Mojdeh Jalali Heravi, # 28 Decl of Vahid Jazayeri, # 29 Decl of Mohammad Shafiei Khadem, # 30 Decl of Ahmad Moghaddam, # 31 Decl of Younes Nouri, # 32 Decl of Proshat Parsimoghadam, # 33 Decl of Emad Soroush, # 34 Decl of Tannaz Sattari Tabrizi, # 35 Decl of Seyed Danial Vaezi, # 36 Decl of Banafsheh Samareh Abolhasani, # 37 Decl of Armin Alaghi, # 38 Decl of Pegah Jalali Asheghabadi, # 39 3rd Decl of Rovy Branon, # 40 5th Decl of Asif Chaudhry, # 41 Decl of Maryam Dadkhahan, # 42 Decl of Jason Detwiler, # 43 2nd Decl of David Eaton, # 44 Decl of Kiana Ehsani, # 45 Decl of Ali Farhadi, # 46 Decl of Hoda Farhadi, # 47 Decl of Maryam Fayazi, # 48 Decl of Mohammad Ghaedi, # 49 Decl of Anne Greenbaum, # 50 Decl of Hannaneh Hajishirzi, # 51 2nd Decl of Deirdre Heatwole, # 52 Decl of Parisa Hosseinzadeh, # 53 Decl of Adam Mokhalalati, # 54 Decl of Shima Nofallah, # 55 4th Decl of Jeffrey Riedinger, # 56 Decl of Solmaz Shakerifard, # 57 Decl of Khadijeh Sheikhan, # 58 Decl of Ali Shojaie, # 59 Decl of Hema Yoganarasimhan, # 60 2nd Decl of Kathy Oline, # 61 2nd Decl of Dave Soike, # 62 2nd Decl of Rita Zawaideh, # 63 2nd Decl of Mitra Akhtari, # 64 2nd Decl of Melanie de Leon, # 65 Decl of Payam Fotouhiyehpour, # 66 2nd Decl of Marc Overbeck, # 67 2nd Decl of Sana Parsian, # 68 Decl of Sahar Z. Zangenah, # 69 2nd Decl of Dennis Galvan, # 70 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
October 11, 2017 Filing 193 MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings, filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
July 6, 2017 Filing 192 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington.(Melody, Colleen)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to file the Joint Status Report on the continued stay in this case. Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 22, 2017 Filing 190 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Submitting Joint Status Report by parties (Bennett, Michelle)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting Defendants' 175 Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump. Should circumstances change such that lifting the stay is warranted, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying Movant Lamar C. Chapman, III's 185 Motion for leave to appear as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Chapman via the USPS
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge James L Robart denying Movant Kareem Salessi's 186 Motion for Reconsideration. (PM) cc: Salessi via the USPS
May 4, 2017 Filing 186 MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by Movant Kareem Salessi. (SWT)
April 24, 2017 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae, filed by Movant Lamar C Chapman, III. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, # 2 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 3 Notice of correspondence from USDC Eastern District of WA) Noted by Clerk for 5/12/2017. (PM)
April 14, 2017 Filing 184 REPLY, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 175 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump (Bennett, Michelle)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 176 Motion for an extension of time to file a response to Plaintiffs' second amended complaint. Defendants response to the second amended complaint is now due seven (7) days after the court's disposition of Defendants' pending motion to stay the entire case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying pro se movant Silver Cloud Musafir's 181 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Musafir via the USPS
April 12, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION for Reconsideration re 90 Order Striking Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Silver Cloud Musafir on behalf of Amicus Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation. (SWT)
April 10, 2017 Filing 180 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon, to 175 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump. (Melody, Colleen)
April 7, 2017 Filing 179 REPLY, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, TO RESPONSE to 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Bennett, Michelle)
April 5, 2017 Filing 178 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Washington, Intervenor Plaintiff State of Oregon, to 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Melody, Colleen)
April 5, 2017 Filing 177 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Melody, Colleen)
March 30, 2017 Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/7/2017, (Bennett, Michelle)
March 30, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Appeal in Hawaii v. Trump, filed by Defendants John Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Bennett Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/14/2017, (Bennett, Michelle)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO INTERVENE by David A. Golden 121 , Kareem Salessi, Ann Dawson 167 and Rick Satcher 173 . Further, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by any of these pro se litigants on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Golden, Salessi, Dawson, Satcher via the U.S. Mail
March 27, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant Rick Satcher. Noted by Clerk for 4/14/2017.(SWT)
March 24, 2017 Filing 172 MANDATE of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The judgment of this Court, entered March 08, 2017, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. DISMISSED. (SG)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re 169 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jesse M. Boodoo for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER re 168 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Genevieve Nadeau for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 24, 2017 Filing 169 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jesse M. Boodoo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4817286 (Melody, Colleen)
March 24, 2017 Filing 168 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Genevieve C. Nadeau FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4817269 (Melody, Colleen)
March 17, 2017 Filing 167 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant Ann Dawson (filing pro se). Noted by Clerk for 4/7/2017. (Filed as a motion per direction of chambers) (PM)
March 17, 2017 Filing 165 AMENDED ORDER of USCA (17-35106) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER staying the court's determination of Plaintiffs' 148 Motion for TRO. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to remove this motion from its calendar. Should circumstances change such that lifting the stay is warranted, either party may move to lift the stay. If the stay is lifted, the court will then rule on Plaintiffs' TRO motion, if appropriate, as soon as practicable. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying Plaintiff State of Washington's 119 emergency motion to enforce the court's preliminary injunction EO1 against Sections 2(c) and 6(a) of EO2. In addition, the court grants the various motions to file amicus curiae briefs (Dkt. ## 125 , 127 , 139 , 144 , 145 , 147 ), but denies one such motion 156 for the reasons stated in footnote one of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Victor Williams via the USPS
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re 161 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lourdes M. Rosado for Plaintiffs State of New York, and State of New York, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Filing 161 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lourdes M. Rosado FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs State of New York, State of New York (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4807610 (Melody, Colleen)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re 149 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth N. Dewar for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER re 143 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven Obus for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re 142 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tiffany M. Woo for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re 140 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Terrance J Nolan for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 156 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Victor Williams; added Amicus Curiae Brief as an Attachment; Notice of Electronic Filing with Brief resent to all counsel. (PM)
March 16, 2017 Filing 156 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae, filed by Amicus Victor Williams (filing pro se). (PM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2017: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief) (PM).
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re 138 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Seth D. Fiur for Amicus New York University, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re 135 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven M Sullivan for State of Maryland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER re 134 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra Robert Gordon for State of California, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 16, 2017 Filing 152 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants John Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, Rex Tillerson, filed by State of Oregon, State of New York, State of Washington, State of California, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (AD)
March 15, 2017 Filing 166 MOTION to Intervene (Request for Judicial Notice of Facts and Documents), filed by Movant Kareem Salessi (filing pro se) Noted for 3/31/2017, per direction of chambers. (PM)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump (SG)
March 15, 2017 Filing 150 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Noah Purcell and Colleen Melody for St. of WA; appearing by phone: Scott Kalpan for St. of OR; Def Counsel: Chad Readler, Stacey Young; appearing by phone: Michelle Bennett; CR: Andrea Ramirez; Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt # 118 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is GRANTED. The Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 118-1) is now the operative complaint. The court hears from counsel re: the schedule of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 148 ), and takes the matter under advisement. (AD)
March 15, 2017 Filing 149 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth N. Dewar FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4806355 (Melody, Colleen)
March 15, 2017 Filing 148 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Purcell, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/15/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
March 14, 2017 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Johnson Declaration, # 3 Albright et al Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Barnard, Kathleen)
March 14, 2017 Filing 146 RESPONSE, by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to 119 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction. (Bennett, Michelle)
March 14, 2017 Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus New York University. Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae and Brief of Amici Curiae, filed by Amicus City of Chicago. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Solomon, Benna)
March 14, 2017 Filing 143 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven E. Obus FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804778 (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 142 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tiffany M. Woo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804769 (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 141 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Center for Law & Justice (Vander Wel, W.)
March 14, 2017 Filing 140 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Terrance J. Nolan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804753 (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Opposing Emergency Motion, filed by Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Opposing Motion, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Vander Wel, W.)
March 14, 2017 Filing 138 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Seth D. Fiur FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus New York University (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4804733 (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Catherine Wright Smith on behalf of Amicus New York University. (Smith, Catherine)
March 14, 2017 Attorney Michelle L. Maley added for International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations per 122 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
March 14, 2017 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chad A. Readler on behalf of Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Readler, Chad)
March 14, 2017 Filing 135 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Sullivan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Maryland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803777 (Melody, Colleen)
March 14, 2017 Filing 134 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra Robert Gordon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of California (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803758 (Melody, Colleen)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re 130 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benna Solomon for Amicus City of Chicago, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re 124 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan Hafetz for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re 123 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aaron X. Fellmeth for International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 14, 2017 Filing 130 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benna Ruth Solomon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus City of Chicago (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4803336 (Seu, Carlton)
March 14, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carlton Wm Seu on behalf of Amicus City of Chicago. (Seu, Carlton)
March 13, 2017 Filing 128 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 123 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 124 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to Shorten Time for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs re 125 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion , filed by Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/13/2017, (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion, filed by Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/13/2017, (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 124 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan Hafetz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4802954 (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 123 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aaron X. Fellmeth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4802930 (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph M McMillan on behalf of Amicus International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. (McMillan, Joseph)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER directing Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs' 119 Emergency Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction. Response due no later than 4:30 p.m., Pacific Daylight Time, on March 14, 2017. The court will defer scheduling a hearing, if any, on Plaintiffs' emergency motion until after it has reviewed Defendants' response. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 13, 2017 Filing 119 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/14/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
March 13, 2017 Filing 118 Second MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Second Amended, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Index of Declarations, # 4 Decl. of R. Althaibani, # 5 Decl. of S. Amin, # 6 Decl. of B. Callaghan, # 7 Decl. of S. Dadgari, # 8 Decl. of A. Elfgeeh, # 9 Decl. of N. Fallah, # 10 Decl. of H. Ghasemzadeh, # 11 Decl. of E. Hassett, # 12 Decl. of A. Mubarez, # 13 Decl. of S. Parsian, # 14 Decl. of Z. Rasouli, # 15 Decl. of A. Shayegan, # 16 Decl. of J. Sime, # 17 Decl. of R. Branon, # 18 Decl. of A. Chaudhry, # 19 Decl. of D. Eaton, # 20 Decl. of D. Heatwole, # 21 Decl. of S. Hemmati, # 22 Decl. of R. Lewin, # 23 Decl. of A. Mehrizi-Sani, # 24 Decl. of V. Rabinowitz, # 25 Decl. of J. Riedinger, # 26 Decl. of V. Shah, # 27 Decl. of J. Wasserheit, # 28 Decl. of J. Wasserheit, # 29 Decl. of J. Wood, # 30 Decl. of N. Zimpher, # 31 Decl. of S. Buell, # 32 Decl. of R. Fullerton, # 33 Decl. of P. Johnson, # 34 Decl. of A. Lavine, # 35 Decl. of D. Pashman, # 36 Decl. of M. Rosenn, # 37 Decl. of M. Saunders, # 38 Decl. of J. Simeone, # 39 Decl. of D. Soike, # 40 Decl. of S. Topiwala, # 41 Decl. of J. Truppman, # 42 Decl. of R. Zawaideh, # 43 Decl. of M. Akhtari, # 44 Decl. of M. de Leon, # 45 Decl. of R. Eskandari, # 46 Decl. of T. Johnson, # 47 Decl. of E. Scherzer, # 48 Decl. of W. Berkovitz, # 49 Decl. of D. Duea, # 50 Decl. of L. Warren, # 51 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/31/2017, (Melody, Colleen)
March 10, 2017 Filing 121 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Movant David A Golden (filing pro se) (PM)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF THE FILING OF A NEW EXECUTIVE ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE re 108 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying Petitioner James J. O'Hagan's 110 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: James O'Hagan via the USPS
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying Petitioner Mikki the Mime's 109 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(PM) cc: Joseph A. Camp and Mikki the Mime via the USPS
March 9, 2017 Filing 114 RESPONSE by Plaintiff State of Minnesota re 108 Notice-Other (Campion, Jacob)
March 9, 2017 Filing 113 RESPONSE by Plaintiff State of Washington re 108 Notice-Other Notice of Filing of Executive Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Purcell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Melody, Colleen)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting the State of Oregon's 94 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump Appellants unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. 186) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). By agreement of the parties, costs in the amount of $126.36 are taxed to appellants. DISMISSED (SG)
March 6, 2017 Filing 110 MOTION for Reconsideration re 83 Order on Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (PM)
March 6, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE of Filing of Executive Order ; filed by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, Michelle)
March 2, 2017 Filing 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 91 Order on Motion to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Mikki the Mime (filing pro se). (PM)
February 28, 2017 Filing 107 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Colleen Melody for State of WA, Jacob Campion for Stat of MN; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2017 re: defendants' request to extend deadlines in the court's Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report (Dkt. # 87 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants the request. The deadlines are extended as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline extended to 3/15/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline extended to 3/29/2017, Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2017. (AD)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. Appellants motion to hold this appeal in abeyance is denied (Docket Entry No. 178). On our own motion, we extend the briefing schedule for this appeal. The opening brief is due March 10, 2017; the answering brief is due March 31, 2017; and the optional reply brief is due April 5, 2017. (SG)
February 22, 2017 Filing 105 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Tobias Read in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Ronald L. Adams in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Richard Birkel in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Margarett Everett in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Marc Overbeck in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Lee Po Cha in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Janet Billups in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Howard N. Kenyon in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Dennis Galvan in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 95 DECLARATION of David G. Ellis in Support of State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon re 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla) (Kaplan, Scott)
February 22, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott J Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to State of Oregon's Motion to Intervene) Noting Date 3/17/2017, (Kaplan, Scott)
February 17, 2017 Filing 93 DECLARATION in Opposition to Position Taken by State of Washington and in Continued Representation by Washington Attorney General by Amicus Harry E. Ries (filing pro se) (swt)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The United States has represented to the Court that the President intends to issue a new Executive Order and has urged the Court to hold its consideration of the case until the President issues the new Order. The United States has further represented that it will inform the Court of any new developments. En banc proceedings before this Court are stayed pending further Order of this Court. (SG)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying Mikki the Mime's 88 Motion to Intervene. Further, the court DIRECTS the Clerk to refrain from placing any future filings by Ms. Mime on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration or a notice of appeal of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Mikki the Mime via the USPS
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER striking 85 amicus brief filed by Silver Cloud Masufir. Mr. Masufir filed it in violation of the court's order regarding the filing the amicus curiae briefs. (Order (Dkt. # 84 ).) Mr. Masufir may re-file his brief if he does so in conformity with the court's order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Silver Cloud Masufir with copy of Dkt. 84 , Order via the USPS
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart striking James J. O'Hagan's additional documents 86 and directing the Clerk to refrain from placing any further filings of Mr. O'Hagan on the court's docket for this case, unless the filing is a motion for reconsideration of a notice of appeal of the court's order denying Mr. OHagan's motion to intervene. (PM) cc: O'Hagan via the USPS
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/15/2017. (AD)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFS by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart denying James J. O'Hagan's 79 Motion to Intervene. (PM) cc: O'Hagan via the USPS
February 14, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the telephone conference held on 2/13/2017 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Nancy Bauer, nancy_bauer@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8506. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017, (NB)
February 14, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Chiang on behalf of Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Chiang, Emily)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. The court concludes that the Ninth Circuit has construed the court's TRO (Dkt. # 52 ) as an appealable preliminary injunction and that further briefing or the submission of evidence concerning a preliminary injunction would not be appropriate in this court during the pendency of Defendants' appeal. However, the court ORDERS the parties to continue with other aspects of this litigation in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's Local Civil Rules. If issues or motions subsequently arise that either party believes are inextricably bound up with the injunctive order, the court will address those motions or issues on a case-by-case basis in accordance with the case law set forth above. Finally, the court VACATES the briefing schedule set forth in its February 7, 2017, order (Dkt. # 57 ). (PM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Intervenor Mikki the Mime (filing pro se). (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (PM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE OF REAL PARTY OF INTEREST JOINING OR INTERVENING AND NOTICE OF COUNTER CLAIM FOR DAMAGES filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Real Party of Interest James O'Hagan, # 2 Declaration of Process Server) (PM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 85 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DKT. 90 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in response to Judge Robart's TRO by Amicus Parties Northern Cheyenne Nation, Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation, Sec Am Tek Tek Tribe, Washitaw Nation (PM) Modified on 2/16/2017 to indicate this document is stricken. (PM).
February 13, 2017 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM/DECLARATION filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan re 79 MOTION to Intervene (filing pro se). (PM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 77 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Colleen Melody for State of WA; Alan Gilbert and Jacob Campion for State of MN; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett; CR: Nancy Bauer; Telephone Conference held on 2/13/2017. The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs' Memorandum (Dkt. # 75 ) and Defendants' Memorandum (Dkt. # 76 ). An oral ruling is made by the court with a written order to follow. (AD)
February 13, 2017 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM re 74 Minute Order,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,,,, by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America (Bennett, Michelle)
February 13, 2017 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM Re: NInth Circuit Construal of TRO as Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs State of Minnesota, State of Washington (Melody, Colleen)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. At Defendants' request, the court held a telephone conference concerning the Order Regarding the State of Washington's February 9, 2017, Letter ("Order"). (Order (Dkt. # 71 ).) Colleen M. Melody of the Washington State Attorney General's Office appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Michelle R. Bennett of the United States Department of Justice, Civil Division of Federal Programs, appeared on behalf of Defendants. During the telephone conference, Defendants asked the court for additional time to respond to the court's Order. The court heard from counsel for both Plaintiffs and Defendants on this issue. The court GRANTS Defendants' request and MODIFIES its Order as follows: (1) Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each file a separate memorandum no later than 12:00 p.m., Pacific Standard Time ("PST") on Monday, February 13, 2017. (2) Each side's memorandum shall discuss whether the Ninth Circuit has construed the court's temporary restraining order ("TRO") (TRO (Dkt. # 52 )) as a preliminary injunction, such that additional briefing and possible evidence on a motion for preliminary injunction is no longer required in the district court, see Washington v. Trump, No. 17-35105, slip op. at 7-8, Dkt. # 134 (9th Cir. 2017) ("[W]e believe... that the TRO should be considered to have the qualities of a reviewable preliminary injunction."); or whether the parties should submit additional briefing and evidence in the district court concerning the issue of a preliminary injunction, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(3). (3) The parties shall limit the length of their memoranda to eight pages. (4) The court RESCHEDULES the telephonic hearing previously set at 11:00 a.m., PST, on Monday, February 13, 2017 (see Order at 2), to 3:00 p.m., PST, on Monday, February 13, 2017. (AD)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. A judge on this Court has made a sua sponte request that a vote be taken as to whether the order issued by the three judge motions panel on February 9, 2017, should be reconsidered en banc. A sua sponte en banc call having been made, the parties are instructed to file simultaneous briefs setting forth their respective positions on whether this matter should be reconsidered en banc. The briefs should be filed on or before 11:00 a.m., Pacific time, on Thursday, February 16. The supplemental briefs shall be filed electronically and consist of no more than 14,000 words. See General Order 5.4(c)(3). (RE)
February 10, 2017 Filing 72 The telephone conference scheduled for Monday, February 13, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. PST will be conducted in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REGARDING THE STATE OF WASHINGTON'S FEBRUARY 9, 2017, LETTER dkt 70 ; the parties are directed to submit a joint status report no later than Sunday, 2/12/17 at 11:59pm, Pacific Standard Time. The court also schedules a telephone conference on Monday, 2/13/2017 at 11:00 AM, PST, to discuss the parties' JSR by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
February 9, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION to Intervene and Notice of Counter Claim for Damages, filed by Intervenor Defendant James J O'Hagan (filing pro se). (PM)
February 9, 2017 Filing 70 LETTER from Plaintiffs re Briefing (Purcell, Noah)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. The motions for leave to file amicus curiae briefs, to file a substitute or amended amicus curiae brief, and for an extension of time to file an amicus curiae brief, are granted. (SG)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. For The foregoing reasons, the emergency motion for a stay pending appeal is DENIED.(SG)
February 9, 2017 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT A. Chaudhry filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Melody, Colleen)
February 9, 2017 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT R. Branon filed by Plaintiff State of Washington (Melody, Colleen)
February 9, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Seungchul Chang on behalf of Amicus Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Chang, Robert)
February 9, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Melissa R Lee on behalf of Amicus Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality. (Lee, Melissa)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 58 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alan I. Gilbert for State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 7, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John R Tyler on behalf of Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Tyler, John)
February 7, 2017 Filing 58 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alan Isaac Gilbert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Minnesota (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4759158 (Campion, Jacob)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary injunction no later than 11:59pm Pacific Standard Time on 2/9/17; defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiffs' motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/15/17; plaintiffs to file their reply in support of their motion no later than 11:59pm PST on 2/17/17 by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) Modified on 2/7/2017 to cc Ninth Circuit. (RE)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG)
February 6, 2017 Filing 56 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Melody, Colleen)
February 6, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiff Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle. (Bergman, Matthew)
February 6, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion for TRO held on 2/3/2017 before Judge James L. Robart.<p>Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.<p>Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at <a href= http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov target=_blank>www.wawd.uscourts.gov</a>.<p>To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Debbie Zurn, debbie_zurn@wawd.uscourts.gov, 206-370-8504.<p> Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2017, (DZ)
February 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER of USCA (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG)
February 4, 2017 Filing 59 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (17-35105) as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, John Kelly, United States of America, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump. (SG)
February 4, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (17-35105) re 52 Temporary Restraining Order by Defendants John Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle) Modified on 2/7/2017 - Add Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals case number (SG).
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
February 3, 2017 Filing 51 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart - Dep Clerk: Ashleigh Drecktrah; Pla Counsel: Noah Purcell, Colleen Melody, Jacob Campion; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett, John Tyler; CR: Debbie Zurn; TRO Hearing held on 2/3/2017. Opening remarks from the court. The court grants the following motions: Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by ACLU (Dkt. # 26 ); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Service Employees International Union (Dkt. # 42 ); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Amicus Law Professors (Dkt. # 45 ); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Washington State Labor Council (Dkt. # 46 ); Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State (Dkt. # 48 ). The court hears from counsel re: Plaintiffs State of Washington and State of Minnesota's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 3 ) and Plaintiffs' Amendment to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. # 19 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A written order will follow. (AD)
February 3, 2017 Attorney Claire Loebs Davis,Tiffany Scott Connors,Jessica Walder for Law Professors added; per 44 Notice-Other. (PS)
February 2, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE, by Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America, to 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Authoritative Guidance)(Bennett, Michelle)
February 2, 2017 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Americans United for Separation of Church and State (Silverman, Kristin)
February 2, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Americans United for Separation of Church and State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Silverman, Kristin)
February 2, 2017 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jeff Johnson filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council re 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (Robbins, Jennifer)
February 2, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Washington State Labor Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Robbins, Jennifer)
February 2, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Law Professors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Davis, Claire)
February 2, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance ; filed by Amicus Law Professors. (Davis, Claire)
February 2, 2017 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Trisha Pande filed by Amicus Service Employees International Union re 42 MOTION for Leave to File Service Employees Internationsl Union's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Berman, Steve)
February 2, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Service Employees Internationsl Union's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A (SEIU's Amicus Brief)) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Berman, Steve)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jacob Campion for State of Minnesota, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(vb)
February 2, 2017 Filing 40 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jacob Campion FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Washington (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4756187 (Purcell, Noah)
February 2, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew M Volk on behalf of Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Volk, Andrew)
February 2, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve W. Berman on behalf of Amicus Service Employees International Union. (Berman, Steve)
February 2, 2017 Filing 37 NOTIFICATION REGARDING PROPOSED VIDEO RECORDING. All parties have consented to the video recording of the TRO hearing on 2/3/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge, the proceeding will be video recorded as part of the CAMERAS Pilot Project. (AD)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew Nellis for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kelly M Percival for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric Rothschild for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
February 2, 2017 Filing 33 Second DECLARATION of Emily Chiang filed by Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU) re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Lawrence, Paul)
February 2, 2017 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Lawrence, Paul)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradley Girard for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 2, 2017 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew Nellis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755570 (Calfo, Angelo)
February 2, 2017 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly M. Percival FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755561 (Calfo, Angelo)
February 2, 2017 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric Rothschild FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755537 (Calfo, Angelo)
February 2, 2017 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Bradley Girard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4755401 (Calfo, Angelo)
February 2, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Noting Date 2/2/2017, (Lawrence, Paul)
February 2, 2017 Attorney Kymberly K. Evanson for American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU) added; per 25 Notice of Appearance. (vb)
February 2, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul J Lawrence on behalf of Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU). (Lawrence, Paul)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard B Katskee for Americans United For Church and State, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 2, 2017 Attorney Angelo J Calfo for Americans United For Church and State added; per 22 Notice of Appearance. (vb)
February 2, 2017 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard B. Katskee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus Americans United For Church and State (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4754982 (Silverman, Kristin)
February 2, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin W Silverman on behalf of Amicus Americans United For Church and State. (Silverman, Kristin)
February 2, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arjun Garg on behalf of Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Garg, Arjun)
February 2, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Bennett on behalf of Defendants John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Bennett, Michelle)
February 1, 2017 Filing 19 AMENDMENT TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER to 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs State of Minnesota, State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Citation Notice of Amended Citations)(Purcell, Noah)
February 1, 2017 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)
February 1, 2017 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT BRIEF RE STANDING by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kathy Oline, # 2 Exhibit Second Declaration of Jeffrey Riedinger, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of John Boesenberg, # 4 Exhibit Second Declaration of Asif Chaudhry, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of David Schumacher, # 6 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Strus)(Purcell, Noah)
January 31, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marsha J. Chien on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chien, Marsha)
January 31, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricio A. Marquez on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marquez, Patricio)
January 31, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Elizabeth Egeler on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Egeler, Anne)
January 31, 2017 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Defendants on 1/31/2017, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Melody, Colleen)
January 31, 2017 Filing 12 Summonses electronically issued as to defendant(s) John F. Kelly, Tom Shannon, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(CDA)
January 31, 2017 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Summons President Trump, # 2 Summons US Dep't of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons Secretary John Kelly, # 4 Summons Acting Secretary Tom Shannon, # 5 Summons United State of America)(Purcell, Noah)
January 31, 2017 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez (for Judge James L Robart)- Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Noah Percell, Colleen Melody; Def Counsel: Michelle Bennett, John Tyler, Arjun Garge; CR: Nancy Bauer; Time of Hearing: 11:30 AM; Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2017. Court sets the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff supplemental brief re issue of standing (limit 6 page) due 2/1/17 by 6:00 PM PST; Defendants' brief (limit 30 pages) due 2/2/17 by 12:00 midnight PST. TRO Hearing set for 2/3/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (LC)
January 30, 2017 Filing 9 DECLARATION OF JEFFREY RIEDINGER of Jeffrey Riedinger re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF EMILY CHIANG of Emily Chiang re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ)
January 30, 2017 Filing 7 DECLARATION OF ROBERT DZIELAK of Robert Dzielak re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 NOTICE to Filer: ATTACHMENT FILED SEPARATELY: In the future, please remember the Civil Cover Sheet, the Summons(es) (if applicable) and the Report Regarding Trademarks and Patents (if applicable) MUST be attachments to your initiating document. Thank you. (DJ)
January 30, 2017 Filing 6 DECLARATION AYESHA BLACKWELL-HAWKINS of Ayesha Blackwell-Hawkins, ESQ. re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 5 DECLARATION OF ASIF CHAUDHRY of Asif Chaudhry re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 4 DECLARATION OF NOAH PURCELL re 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/30/2017, (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Purcell, Noah)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4751332), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Purcell, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington, et al., v. Trump., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Marsha J. Chien
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Egeler
Represented By: Robert W Ferguson
Represented By: Patricio A. Marquez
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Noah Guzzo Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Scott J Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Robert A Scott(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven M Sullivan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Jesse M. Boodoo(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Genevieve Nadeau(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Represented By: Lourdes M. Rosado(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: John R Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: John R Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle R. Bennett
Represented By: Arjun Garg
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: John R Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Tillerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine C. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Americans United for Separation of Church and State
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Bradley Girard(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Richard B Katskee(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrew Nellis
Represented By: Kelly M Percival
Represented By: Eric Rothschild
Represented By: Kristin W Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU)
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Kymberly K. Evanson
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Andrew M Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Law Professors
Represented By: Tiffany Scott Connors
Represented By: Claire Loebs Davis
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Washington State Labor Council
Represented By: Kathleen Phair Barnard
Represented By: Dmitri Iglitzin
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Melissa R Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Harry E. Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations
Represented By: Aaron X. Fellmeth(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Jonathan Hafetz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michelle L. Maley
Represented By: Joseph M McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: City of Chicago
Represented By: Carlton Wm Seu
Represented By: Benna Solomon(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New York University
Represented By: Seth D. Fiur(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Howard M. Goodfriend
Represented By: Terrance J Nolan(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Steven Obus(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Catherine Wright Smith
Represented By: Tiffany M. Woo(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Center for Law & Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?