April 27, 2018 |
Filing
99
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 95 Motion to amend and/or to seek relief from the judgment in favor of Snohomish County signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff Kenneth Shavlik via first class mail)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
96
MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's 95 MOTION to Set Aside 82 Judgment by Court, 81 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment to 4/13/2018. Defendant Snohomish County may file a response in opposition no later than April 9, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting 90 91 Stipulated Motion for Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Counsel. Attorney Amos R Hunter is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: plaintiffs via first class mail.
|
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
87
MINUTE ORDER re: attorney Amos Hunter's 86 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiffs. Counsel is directed to move for leave to withdraw. Mr. Hunter will remain counsel of record until such time as the Court grants him leave to withdraw. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting City's and Fire District's summary judgment motions (Dkt. Nos. 29 , 34 ) on all claims and denying Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 33 ). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
72
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
71
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 70 Stipulated Motion for Continuance of Motions for Summary Judgment and to Adjust Case Schedule. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note both Defendant City of Snohomish's and Defendant Snohomish County F ire Protection District No. 4's motions for summary judgment (Dkt. Nos 29 & 34 ), as well as Plaintiffs' cross-motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 33 ) to February 16, 2018. Discovery Cutoff is reset to March 26, 2018, and the parties' deadline to certify that they have engaged in Alternative Dispute Resolution is Friday, April 6, 2018. All other dates remain unchanged. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
68
MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 67 Joint Motion for continuance of the filing deadlines for supplemental briefing on Defendant City of Snohomish's outstanding MSJ. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-note Defendant City of Snohomish's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 34 ) to February 2, 2018. Plaintiffs' Opposition is due January 29, 2018 and Defendant City of Snohomish's Reply is due February 2, 2018. In the interest of judicial efficiency, the Clerk is further D IRECTED to re-note Defendant Snohomish County Fire District's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 29 ) and Plaintiffs' cross-motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 33 ) to February 2, 2018 as well. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
January 5, 2018 |
Filing
66
ORDER. This matter comes before the Court pursuant to its discovery order awarding Plaintiffs attorney fees. (See Dkt. No. 64 at 2.) The Court has since received a declaration from Plaintiffs' counsel, Amos Hunter (Dkt. No. 65 ). The declara tion adequately supports the amount of time preparing Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. No. 52 ). Further, Mr. Hunter's rates are reasonable. The Court excludes the time spent to meet and confer and GRANTS Plaintiff $862.50 in attorney fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Compel. The Fire District is DIRECTED to respond to Plaintiffs' request for deposition upon written questions (Dkt. No. 53 at 712) and to pay $500 in sanctions within ten (10) days of this order. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to provide an accounting of the expenses incurred in bringing their motion to compel for purposes of an award within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing
63
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 61 Motion to continue. Clerk is directed to renote Defendant Snohomish County Fire Protection District No. 4's and Defendant City of Snohomish's motions for summary judgment (Dkt. Nos. 29 , 34 ), and Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 33 ) to January 19, 2019. Oppositions due 1/15/2018; Replies due 1/19/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing
27
MINTUE ORDER granting Defendant Snohomish County Fire Protection District's 26 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant 10 additional pages, bringing to the total number of pages to 34. This page limit will also apply to Plaintiffs' opposition brief; Defendant's reply brief will be limited to 17 pages. LCR 7(f)(4). Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying plaintiffs' 20 Motion for declaratory relief signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
|