Dance v. United States of America
Petitioner: David Richard Dance
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00156
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying Petitioner's 21 Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) (Dkt. # 21 . Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: Petitioner via first class mail
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying Petitioner's 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence ; denying Petitioner's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Petitioner via USPS)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting petitioner's 12 Motion for Extension of Time; petitioner's reply is due 6/24/17; clerk directed to renote govt's 9 MOTION/RESPONSE to 6/24/17 signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc petitioner
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting petitioner's 10 Motion for Extension of Time; petitioner's reply is now due 6/9/17 and the govt's 9 response is renoted to 6/9/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc petitioner
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting govt's 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; answer due by 4/3/17 and petitioner's reply due within 30 days after answer is due by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc petitioner
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc petitioner
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dance v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Richard Dance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Hugo Torres(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?