Garcia v. Equifax et al
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Gabriel Garcia
Defendant: Carolinas Medical Center and Medical Data Systems
Case Number: 2:2017cv00158
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendants' 20 22 Motions to Dismiss and denying Plaintiffs' 26 32 Motions to Amend. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) Modified on 8/16/2017: copy sent to Plaintiff via the U.S. Mail (PM).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER terminating Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Case construed as RESPONSE to defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US Marshal upon Defendants Carolinas Medical Center and Medical Data Systems. Authorized by by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) (cc: order, complaint, summons, USMO Forms to USMO; order sent to plaintiff via the U.S. Mail)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide a different address for Defendant Carolinas Medical Center within 14 days of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the USPS
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 MOTION to have US Marshal serve summons; DIRECTING SERVICE by US Marshal to Defendants Carolinas Medical Center and Medical Data Systems. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (swt) (cc: Plaintiff, USMO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Equifax et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Gabriel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolinas Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?