Kinney et al v. City of Lynnwood et al
Plaintiff: Seth Joseph Kinney and Rachel Kinney
Defendant: City of Lynnwood, Curtis Zatylny, Emily Zatylny, Chuck Steichen and Carri Steichen
Case Number: 2:2017cv00159
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having advised the Court that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and withou t costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Washington State Dept of Labor)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's 41 MOTION for Reconsideration; setting Telephonic Hearing for 5/29/2018 at 11:00 AM on the motion; RENOTING 41 MOTION for Reconsideration : Noting Date 5/29/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 31 Motion for Extension of Deadline to Disclose David Musnic, MD as an expert. The Court declines defendant's request to award attorney's fees and costs. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 28 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date: Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 6/18/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Motions in Limine due by 5/17/2018, Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2018, Pretrial Confe rence is RESET for 6/8/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/31/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/31/2018; amending 8 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (see Minute Order). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Clerk to update docket to reflect that Curtis and Emily Zatylyn are no longer defendants in this matter. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Curtis Zatylny and Emily Zatylny terminated.) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Defendants Chuck Steichen and Carri Steichen and Dismissal of Plaintiff Rachel Kinney's Claims re parties' 17 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(Chuck Steichen, Carri Steichen, Rachel Kinney terminated.) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Discovery Cut-Off for Deposition of Ernest Burwell Only re parties' 15 Stipulation; the Court authorizes the parties to conduct the deposition of Ernest Burwell on February 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' 9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer; Defendants shall electronically file their amended answer within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney et al v. City of Lynnwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Joseph Kinney
Represented By: Josef Theodore Reibel
Represented By: William Henry Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kinney
Represented By: Josef Theodore Reibel
Represented By: William Henry Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lynnwood
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Represented By: Ann E Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Zatylny
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Represented By: Ann E Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Zatylny
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Represented By: Ann E Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Steichen
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Represented By: Ann E Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carri Steichen
Represented By: Thomas P Miller
Represented By: Ann E Trivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?