Holland v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Holland
Defendant: City of Seattle, County of King and Bush
Case Number: 2:2017cv00170
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER terminating this action pursuant to the request of the parties. Authorized by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff)(ST)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; this action is re-referred to Judge Theiler for resolution by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc plaintiff
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. The plaintiff shall file an amended complaint or advise the Court that he does, in fact, wish to dismiss the action by May 1, 2017. (cc: plaintiff with Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights form)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?