City of Everett v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: City of Everett
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP, Purdue Pharma Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc and John and Jane Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00209
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying Defendants' 31 Motion to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Time to Answer or Respond to Amended Complaint re parties' 41 Stipulated Motion. Defendants' answer and/or response to the Amended Complaint shall be filed by November 29, 2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TH)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 33 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time re Defendants' 31 Motion to Certify Question to the Washington Supreme Court. Plaintiff's opposition brief due 10/30/2017; Reply due 11/17/2017. The 31 Motion to Certify is re-noted to 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave file an amended complaint no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion re deadline for filing reply brief; reply brief deadline extended to 6/16/17; 8 MOTION to Dismiss is renoted for 6/19/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Stipulated Motion re briefing schedule and page limits on motion to dismiss ; renoting dfts' 8 MOTION to Dismiss : Noting Date 6/9/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion regarding deadline for filing amended complaint and/or briefing on motion to dismiss; 8 MOTION to Dismiss is renoted for 5/19/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Stipulated Motion to extend time for defendants to respond to complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Everett v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Everett
Represented By: Michael A. Goldfarb
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Kit W Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Stephanie R Lakinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Stephanie R Lakinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Stephanie R Lakinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?