Lewis v. Green
Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Defendant: Ethan Green
Case Number: 2:2017cv00211
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting defendant's 22 Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint and this action; denying plaintiff's 29 Request to Certify; by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)(SWT)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER continuing the deadline for filing objections to 26 Report and Recommendations: Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2018; R&R RENOTED to 3/30/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Justin Lewis, Prisoner ID: 807814)(SWT)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendant's 19 Motion to Amend Court's Order RE: Pretrial Preparations as follows: Discovery completed by 11/30/2017, Dispositive motions due by 1/10/2018, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; referring this matter back to Magistrate Judge Theiler for further proceedings; striking as moot Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections; re 16 Report and Recommendations, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Edward Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?