Jinni Tech Ltd et al v. Red.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jinni Tech Ltd and Bruce Royce
Defendant: Red.com, Inc and Jarred Land
Case Number: 2:2017cv00217
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting Defendants' 94 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. As Plaintiffs have no remaining claims, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying in part Plaintiffs' 82 Motion for relief from their summary judgment response deadline. Plaintiffs' response due by 12/6/2019. The court DIRECTS the clerk to re-note RED's summary judgment motion (Dkt. # 79 ) for December 13, 2019. The court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response by December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Defendants' 77 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Brief. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER extending the time for the parties to propose a new case schedule until 14 days after either new counsel for Plaintiffs appear or the time for Plaintiffs to secure new counsel expires. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting Philip Mann's 67 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs, effective 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying defendants' 61 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 49 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re Bruce Royce's 46 Request to deny or postpone the 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The court stays this matter for two (2) weeks from the date of this order to allow Plaintiffs to secure new counsel. The effective date of couns el's withdrawal will be two (2) weeks from the date of this order. If new counsel does not appear for Plaintiffs by that date, Mr. Royce will be required to proceed pro se, and the court will dismiss Jinni Tech's claims for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: copy of order emailed and sent via USPS to Mr. Royce.
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting counsel for plaintiffs' 42 Motion to Withdraw, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)(Attorneys Gregory F Wesner; John E Whitaker; Tiffany Scott Connors and Jeffrey William Reis terminated) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Plaintiffs Jinni Tech, Ltd and Bruce Royce's 36 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiffs' 36 MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The court directs Defendants Red.com, Inc. and Red.com, LLC to jointly respond to Plaintiffs' motion no later than Monday, December 11, 2017. The motion shall remain noted for December 15, 2017. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; The court further STRIKES the portions of the reply relating to the forum selection clause argument, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jinni Tech Ltd et al v. Red.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red.com, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarred Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinni Tech Ltd
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Royce
Represented By: Hozaifa Y Cassubhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?