The Nooksack Indian Tribe v. Zinke et al

Plaintiff: The Nooksack Indian Tribe
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior, Michael S. Black, Weldon Bruce Loudermilk, Stanley M. Speaks, Marcella L. Teters, Timothy Brown, United States of America and Ryan K Zinke
Intervenor_defendant: 271 Nooksack Tribal Members
Case Number: 2:2017cv00219
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Reconsideration signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 13, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER lifting the stay and directing the Clerk to renote Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 45 ) to October 27, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 27, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff and Defendants' 49 Joint Motion to Stay ; terminating Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Reconsideration ; All proceedings in this action STAYED for 120 days ; Joint Status Report due prior to the end of the 120-day period. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
May 26, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Reconsideration of order granting Defendant's motion to dismiss 43 . Response due 6/12/2017; Reply, if any, due 6/16/2017. The 45 Motion for Reconsideration is RENOTED for 6/16/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 11, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting defendants' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
April 11, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Intervenor's 14 Motion to Intervene. The 271 Nooksack Tribal Members shall be made a Defendant-Intervenor in this action. The answer attached to the motion to intervene, (Dkt. No. 14 -2), shall stand as the answer in intervention of the 271 Nooksack Tribal Members in this action. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
April 10, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING plaintiff's 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Noting Date 4/28/2017, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Nooksack Indian Tribe v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nooksack Indian Tribe
Represented By: Ric W Armstrong
Represented By: Connie Sue Manos Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Black
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldon Bruce Loudermilk
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley M. Speaks
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella L. Teters
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Brown
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan K Zinke
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: 271 Nooksack Tribal Members
Represented By: Bree R. Black Horse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?