Kingsgate Ridge Manor Association of Apartment Owners v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: |
Kingsgate Ridge Manor Association of Apartment Owners |
Defendant: |
Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, The American Insurance Company and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00257 |
Filed: |
February 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Washington |
Office: |
Seattle Office |
County: |
King |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas S. Zilly |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
12 U.S.C. § 635 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 30, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice an d without costs to any party. The trial date of June 4, 2018, and all related dates and deadlines are STRICKEN. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
32
STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend discovery cutoff re parties' 31 Stipulated Motion; discovery cutoff is extended to 3/15/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
|
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
28
MINUTE ORDER. By Order entered December 1, 2017, docket no. 26 , the Court directed plaintiff to show cause why its claims against Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Having reviewed plaintiff's response, docket no. 27 , the Court hereby DISMISSES without prejudice plaintiff's claims against Doe Insurance Companies 1-10. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting 25 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against State Farm are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. State Farm's motion for summary judgment 18 is STRICKEN as moot. Plaintiff ordered to show cause within 14 days why its claims against Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 should not also be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
16
MINUTE ORDER to Consolidate Cases re parties' stipulations, docket no. 15 in C17-257 and docket no. 12 in C17-427, the above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers sh all be filed only in Case No. C17-257 TSZ. The trial date and related dates pretrial deadlines set in Case No. C17-257 TSZ shall control. The motion to consolidate, docket no. 13 in C17-257, filed by defendants Firemans Fund Insurance Company, American Insurance Company, and Allianz Risks US Insurance Company, is STRICKEN as moot. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?