Perryman et al v. City of Seattle Police et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Perryman and Sean Perryman
Defendant: City of Seattle Police, Rhino Room and Justin Ismael
Counter_claimant: Justin Ismael
Counter_defendant: Sean Perryman
Case Number: 2:2017cv00274
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re parties' 129 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (cc: Sean Perryman via U.S. Mail) Modified on 2/6/2019 (KERR).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER striking trial and related case management dates and extending stay for another sixty (60) days, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying Defendant Justin Ismael's 115 Motion to Amend Case Schedule. This matter will remain STAYED until 6/13/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying plaintiff's 106 Motion to Deny Defendants' Request re: His Vacation Time, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting Defendants' 93 Motion for Extension of Time. Expert disclosures shall be made on or before January 30, 2018, and all discovery must be completed by March 23, 2018. All other case management deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re plaintiff's 101 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; directing plaintiff to complete the attached Financial Affidavit and file it within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying plaintiff's 91 Request to Depose Defendants in Written Questions, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) cc: doublebro@aol.com per Court's instructions; Plaintiff by USPS
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying plaintiff Sean Perryman's 82 Request for Binding Arbitration; EXTENDING deadline for filing status report until 4:30 pm on 1/5/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (cc: Sean Perryman, Wayne Perryman via USPS)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part defendants' 81 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Defendants' 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; claims asserted by Reverend Wayne Perryman and any claim asserted under RCW 9A.76.175 are hereby DISMISSED, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Amend Complaint; the Court accepts the amended complaint filed on May 31, 2017 as the operativepleading in this matter, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 49 Second Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: Plaintiffs via U.S. Mail) (KERR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot Defendants City of Seattle and Seattle Police Department's 29 Motion to Stay, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perryman et al v. City of Seattle Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle Police
Represented By: Cherie K Getchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Room
Represented By: Jon Walker MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Ismael
Represented By: Herbert Matthew Munson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Paulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Justin Ismael
Represented By: Herbert Matthew Munson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Paulich
Represented By: Herbert Matthew Munson
Represented By: Patrick Michael Paulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Sean Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?