Williams v. Young
Plaintiff: Gerald Williams
Defendant: Michael Young
Case Number: 2:2017cv00280
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER denying motion to strike Ms. Grantham's declaration and exhibit 22 ; granting Plaintiff's request to respond; Plaintiff's evidentiary response due 7/14/2017; Clerk directed to RENOTE the 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; Noting Date is 7/14/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour vacating the 10 Order to Show Cause. A Status Conference is set for 6/27/2017 at 09:00 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 5/26/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Williams
Represented By: Yaida Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?