Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust v. Vitamilk Dairy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust
Defendant: Vitamilk Dairy, Inc. and Does 1 - 25
Case Number: 2:2017cv00291
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting plaintiff's 26 Revised Motion for Default Judgment; directing plaintiff's counsel to personally serve a copy of this Order and the judgment within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER RENOTING plaintiff's 26 MOTION for Default Judgment : Noting Date 8/31/2018. Any response from defendant shall be filed by 8/27/2018, and any reply is due on the new noting date. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Aimee Willig, Molly Oien via USPS)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Lift Stay. Any motion to vacate the entry of default against defendant, see Minute Order (docket no. 9 ), shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this MinuteOrder. Defendant i s REMINDED that, because it is a corporation, it may not act pro se or represent itself, but rather must appear through an attorney authorized to practice before this Court. If no motion to vacate the entry of default is timely filed, then plaintiff may file a renewed motion for default judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH) (cc: Aimee S. Willig and Molly Oien, Counsel of record, via first class mail)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER re 22 Notice of Bankruptcy; the Court STAYS this case until further order; striking without prejudice plaintiff's 17 Motion for Default Judgment; parties shall file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days of the conclusion of bankruptcy proceedings or by June 15, 2018, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's 17 MOTION for Default Judgment: Noting Date 11/3/2017 ; Plaintiff DIRECTED to serve copy of motion to default judgment on defendant Vitamilk Dairy, Inc. ; Defendant is REMINDED that, because it is a corporation, it may not act pro se or represent itself. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Vitamilk Dairy, Inc. via USPS)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Reconsideration. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Default Judgment, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Vitamilk Diary, Inc. via USPS with 9 Minute Order)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with the Order requiring Joint Status Report signed on March 7, 2017, docket no. 3 . Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust v. Vitamilk Dairy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust
Represented By: Douglas M. Lash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitamilk Dairy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?