Holmes-James v. King County Court et al
Plaintiff: Geneva Holmes-James
Defendant: King County Court, Clerk United States District Court and Lonnie C Gulley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00321
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER declining to issue summons in this matter and directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 5/4/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via the USPS
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (swt) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER declining to review 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Filer has until 3/17/2017 to correct IFP deficiency. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(swt) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS - copy of IFP motion and IFP form also mailed)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes-James v. King County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Holmes-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie C Gulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?