Harmony Gold U.S.A., Inc. v Harebrained Schemes LLC et al

Plaintiff: Harmony Gold U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Harebrained Schemes LLC, Harebrained Holdings, Inc., Jordan Weisman, Piranha Games, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00327
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2018 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Withdraw Motions Without Prejudice re parties' 125 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Motions terminated: Plaintiff Harmony Gold U.S.A., Inc's 93 MOTION for Issuance of a Letter of Request, Defendant Piranha Games, Inc's 87 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment)
May 2, 2018 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 97 Unopposed Motion to Seal, Dkt. ## 101 , 102 shall remain under seal; granting plaintiff's 105 Unopposed Motion to Seal, Dkt. ## 111 , 112 shall remain under seal; granting defendant Piranha Games Inc's 117 Unopposed Motion to Seal, Dkt. # 118 shall remain under seal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
April 13, 2018 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER to RENOTE defendant Piranha games Inc's 87 Second Motion for Summary Judgment: Noting date 4/20/2018; dismissing with prejudice and without costs Harmony's claims against Harebrained Schemes LLC, Harebrained Holdings Inc and Jordan Weisman; directing Harmony to SHOW CAUSE by 5/4/2018 why its claims against defendants Does 1-10 should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (Jordan Weisman, Harebrained Holdings, Inc. and Harebrained Schemes LLC terminated.)(SWT)
February 12, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall electronically file its Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order ; striking without prejudice Defendant Piranha Games Inc.'s 47 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Pursuant to parties' 81 Stipulation, the following dates and deadlines are CONTINUED: Jury Trial is set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/1/2018, Motions due by 8/2/2018, Discovery completed by 9/14/2018, Dispositive motions due by 10/11/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/3/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/14/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/14/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 26, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 59 Unopposed Motion to Seal (dkts. 65 , 66 , and 68 shall remain under seal); granting defendant Piranha Games Inc.'s 71 Unopposed Motion to Seal (dkts. 74 , 75 shall remain under seal). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 31, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff Harmony Gold USA, Inc. re parties' 43 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(Attorney Brett A August and Jason Koransky terminated)
June 27, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 40 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 29, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Stipulated Motion to extend the deadline for Harebrained Holdings to file a responsive pleading or motion to 4/24/17 by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(RS)
March 23, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re parties' 17 Stipulated Motion to Extend Piranha Games Inc.'s Deadline to Respond to Complaint. The deadline is EXTENDED to April 24, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (swt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmony Gold U.S.A., Inc. v Harebrained Schemes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmony Gold U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Brett A August(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Damon Clay Elder
Represented By: Andrew R. W. Hughes
Represented By: Jason Koransky(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harebrained Schemes LLC
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Warren Joseph Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harebrained Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Warren Joseph Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Weisman
Represented By: James Harlan Corning
Represented By: Warren Joseph Rheaume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piranha Games, Inc.
Represented By: Paul T Meiklejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?