National Frozen Foods Corporation v. Berkley Assurance Company
Plaintiff: National Frozen Foods Corporation
Defendant: Berkley Assurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00339
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER denying Plaintiff National Frozen Foods Corporation's 108 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying Defendant's 135 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Briefing. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 65 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defendant Berkley shall respond to the Interrogatories listed in this order without objection, within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER denying Defendant's 91 Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule. The Deadline to Exchange Expert Reports is now set for the day after this Order is entered. See Dkt. # 107 . Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting Defendant's 93 Motion for Relief from Expert Disclosure Deadline. Berkley and all other parties shall be relieved from the September 19, 2018, Deadline to Exchange Expert Reports until the Court rules on Berkley's Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule, Dkt. # 91 . Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying Defendant Berkley Assurance Company's 73 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting parties' 76 Stipulated Motion to Amend Discovery Deadlines. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/19/2018, Discovery Motions due by 10/3/2018, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 10/10/2018, Discovery completed by 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Case Scheduling Order re parties' 63 Stipulated Motion; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) deadline is extended to 8/22/2018, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER to amend defendants' answer and affirmative defenses re parties' 60 Stipulated Motion; Defendants AmWINS Brokerage of Illinois, AmWINS Brokerage of Arizona, and AmWINS Group, LLC may amend their First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion Amended Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates: Jury Trial **5 DAYS** is set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Ricardo S Martinez; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2018, Amen ded Pleadings due by 5/14/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/8/2018, Discovery Motions due by 9/10/2018, Discovery completed by 10/8/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2108, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/21/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/7/2019, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs/exhibits due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 46 Stipulated Motion to extend time for Berkley Assurance Company to respond to complaint. Time extended to 12/4/2017. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer; and granting in part Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Confirmation of Venue signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Stipulated Motion. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/28/2017, Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 13 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; Berkley Assurance Company answer due 6/14/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Frozen Foods Corporation v. Berkley Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Frozen Foods Corporation
Represented By: Dale L Kingman
Represented By: Gregory D Pendleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Assurance Company
Represented By: Justin Sean Landreth
Represented By: Diana McMonagle(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Peter J Mintzer
Represented By: Jeffrey S Weinstein(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?