November 3, 2022 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 183 Motion Seeking Order Approving (1) Final Accounting of Settlement Proceeds; and (2) Distribution of Residual Funds to Cy Pres Beneficiary. The final accounting of the distribution of the Settlement Fund t o Class Members is approved. The Court further orders that, pursuant to the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement dated April 26, 2019 that was finally approved by this Court on October 25, 2019, the Supplemental Remainder of the Settlement Fund in the amount of $558.00 be distributed promptly to Legal Foundation of Washington, the cy pres beneficiary designated by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing
182
FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT re: Plaintiff's 166 Motion for Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
June 12, 2019 |
Filing
165
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 163 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
April 9, 2019 |
Filing
162
ORDER directing parties to, no later than 4/26/2019, file either a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement or, if the parties are unable to file such a motion by that date, a joint status report explaining the status of this matter. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing
157
ORDER withdrawing Michelle Peterson's appointment as special master in this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) (Special Master Michelle Peterson terminated)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
154
ORDER Withdrawing Special Master Appointment. The court intends to withdraw Ms. Petersons appointment as special master in this case on 2/25/2019. The court ORDERS any party that wishes to respond to the court's plan to file a brief not to exceed three pages no later than 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
153
STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating pending deadlines and staying case until 2/22/2019, re parties' 152 Stipulated Motion. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
January 2, 2019 |
Filing
147
MINUTE ORDER re Special Master's 146 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Eddie Bauer, LLC's attorney fee declaration must be filed by 1/10/2019. Any Response must be filed by 1/18/2019. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
October 10, 2018 |
Filing
139
ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER signed by Judge James L. Robart. Pursuant to Rule 53 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the terms of this order, the court appoints Michelle Peterson to serve as Special Master. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 53 Declaration of Michelle Peterson) (PM)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing
135
ORDER directing any party that opposes the appointment of Michelle Peterson as Special Master re: discovery disputes to file a brief no later than 10/8/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Michelle Peterson via ECF ad hoc
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
134
ORDER re: discovery disputes; directing full briefing on these issues pursuant to the local rules. Defendant's motion due 10/4/2018, Plaintiff's response due 10/15/2018, Defendant's reply due 10/19/2018. A hearing on the motion is set for 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. The court further STAYS the class certification deadlines pending resolution of these issues. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
130
ORDER re: parties' 129 Stipulation. It is ORDERED, that deadline for conducting depositions is continued to October 11, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing
128
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 115 Motion to Compel signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing
111
ORDER re: privilege log dispute. Parties are directed to file separate statements of no more than three (3) pages no later than Thursday, August 2, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing
110
ORDER re: discovery dispute and directing additional briefing. Defendant Eddie Bauer to file an appropriate discovery motion; Plaintiff to respond. Court orders parties to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the dispute and to file a supplemental brief by no later than the noting date of Defendant's discovery motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
106
ORDER re: discovery requests - directing parties to file separate statements further explaining the nature of the discovery dispute. Statements due no later than Wednesday, July 25, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
103
MINUTE ORDER re: 102 Stipulated MOTION Alter Class Certification Schedule. Telephone Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart. The 102 Stipulated Motion is renote for 7/9/2018. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
May 18, 2018 |
Filing
101
ORDER granting parties' 99 Stipulated Motion to Alter Class Certification Schedule; Discovery related to certification motion completed by 7/13/2018, Motion for class certification due by 8/10/2018, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 87 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Joseph P. Guglielmo in Support of the Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 93 ) is hereby sealed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
|
April 27, 2018 |
Filing
90
ORDER directing Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's 85 MOTION to Compel no later than 5/7/2018 at 5:00 p.m. After response is filed, parties are directed to meet and confer and file a supplemental brief by 5/11/2018 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER re: Plaintiff's 85 Motion to Compel Defendant Eddie Bauer, LLC to produce responsive documents and a privilege log. The court STRIKES Veridian's motion (Dkt. # 85 ) without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. The court ORDERS Eddie Bauer to respond to the motion to seal 87 no later than Wednesday, May 2, 2018, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 78 Stipulated Motion to Establish New Class Discovery Deadline and Class Certification Schedule. Class certification deadline extended to May 22, 2018; Plaintiff's Motion for class certification deadline extended to Wednesday, June 6, 2018. Clerk is directed to cancel the February 13, 2018 telephone conference (see 2/6/2018 Dkt. Entry). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
February 2, 2018 |
Filing
76
ORDER striking Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Compel without prejudice to refiling the motion in a manner that comports with the court's scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing
72
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 71 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Defendant's deadline is extended to 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
November 9, 2017 |
Filing
69
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC's 40 Motion to Dismiss; Veridian may file an amended complaint that is consistent with court's rulings herein. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
|
October 17, 2017 |
Filing
66
ORDER granting 64 Stipulated Motion to Alter Class Certification Schedule. Discovery relating to Plaintiff's class certification motion to be completed by 2/27/2018, Plaintiff's Motion for class certification due by 4/25/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
August 25, 2017 |
Filing
63
AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
August 11, 2017 |
Filing
60
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 59 Stipulated MOTION, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
July 31, 2017 |
Filing
58
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge James L. Robart. Discovery to be completed by 10/30/2017, Motions for class certification due by 11/30/2017. This scheduling order incorporates the deadlines set forth in Docket No. 52 and supplants that order. (PM)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 51 Stipulated Motion to alter class certification schedule. Deadline for plaintiff to file their class certification motion is 11/30/2017; discovery on class certification to be completed by 10/30/2017. This deadline should not be construed as a bifurcation of discovery. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
June 9, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting Defendant's 37 Motion for Leave to File an Over-Length Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; not to exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting defendant's 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Judge James L. Robart.(RS)
|