PrepareMe America, LLC v. Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PrepareMe America, LLC
Defendant: Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC, Tania Lorraine Angel and Mark A. Angel
Thirdparty_defendant: Scott A Kastner and Chad E Allen
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mark A. Angel, Tania Lorraine Angel and Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC
Counter_claimant: Mark A. Angel, Tania Lorraine Angel and Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC
Counter_defendant: PrepareMe America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00359
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Skagit
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 58 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial (3-5 days) is set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Discovery motions due by 1/25/2018, Discovery completed by 3/5/2018, Dispositive motions due by 3/22/2018, Motions in Limine due by 5/17/2018, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/1/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/1/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's 37 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order; denying plaintiff's 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 33 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; This ruling does not affect plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. 33 , which remains noted for 11/17/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER RENOTING Plaintiff's 33 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Noting date 11/3/2017; RENOTING Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Noting date 11/17/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 31 Stipulated MOTION for a Protective Order by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants/Counter Claimants' 24 Motion for Leave to Amend Defendants' Answer and Counterclaims. Defendants shall electronically file their amended pleading within seven (7) days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion; the deadline for exchanging the Initial Disclosures and submitting the Joint Status Report is extended from 6/14/2017 to 7/14/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 13 stipulated motion and the deadline for exchanging initial disclosures and submitting a Joint Status Report is EXTENDED from 5/15/2017 to 6/14/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PrepareMe America, LLC v. Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PrepareMe America, LLC
Represented By: Michael P Matesky, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Lorraine Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Scott A Kastner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Chad E Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Mark A. Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Tania Lorraine Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mark A. Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Tania Lorraine Angel
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Survival Prep Warehouse, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PrepareMe America, LLC
Represented By: Michael P Matesky, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?