Securities and Exchange Commission v. Chen et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Andy Shin Fong Chen, Aero Space Port International Group, Inc, North American Foreign Trade Zone Industries, LLC, Washington Economic Development Capital, LLC, Washington Economic Development Capital II, LLC, EVF, Inc, Moses Lake 96000 Building LLC, Sun Basin Orchards, LLC, PIA, LLC, John Chen, Tom Chen, Bobby Chen and Heidi Chen
Case Number: 2:2017cv00405
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: The Court DISCHARGES its May 4 156 order to show cause; and ADOPTS the SEC's proposed briefing schedule for its third motion for partial final judgment. SEC's motion is due by 6/1/2022. Defendants' response is due by 6/15/2022. SEC's reply is due by 6/29/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Accepting Receiver's 154 Quarterly Status Report. The Receiver is authorized to continue to administer the receivership estate in accordance with the terms of this Court's order appointing him as receiver. The Receiver is authorized to undertake the recommendations presented in the Report. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting Receiver's 143 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Receiver to file his Liquidation Plan is hereby extended to a date thirty (30) days after SEC's third motion for partial final judgment against Defendants Andy Ching Fong Chen and Aero Space Port International Group, Inc. is resolved by this Court. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting in part Receiver's 138 Application re: First Quarterly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Receiver and of Foster Garvey as Receiver's Counsel. The Court APPROVES on an interim basis the application am ounts as described and ORDERS that the Receiver is authorized to disburse 80% of the foregoing approved fees and costs at this time. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) Modified to add additional text and re-generated NEF to all parties on 2/18/2022 (LH).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re Receiver's 135 First Interim Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver Geoffrey B. Winkler. The Receiver's First Interim Report is accepted by this Court. The Receiver is authorized to continue to administer t he receivership estate in accordance with the terms of the Appointment Order. The Receiver is authorized to undertake the recommendations presented in the Petition, including a continued document recovery and review effort, and the engagement of those professionals he deems necessary for the proper administration of the receivership estate. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SR)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re Receiver's 132 Motion for Order Authorizing Engagement of Counsel for Receiver. The Receiver is authorized to employ and compensate Tara J. Schleicher and Foster Garvey PC on the terms set forth. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER APPOINTING A RECEIVER. Geoffrey B. Winkler of American Fiduciary Services is hereby appointed to serve without bond as receiver (the "Receiver") for EDC III. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) Modified on 11/23/2021 to indicate Mr. Winkler received notice via ECF ad hoc (LH).
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the SEC's 106 motion for entry of partial final judgment against Defendants and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' 114 motion to dismiss Relief Defendants. The court DIREC TS the SEC to submit a proposed order for the appointment of a receiver by 11/5/2021. The court DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report on 11/15/2021, and on the 15th of each month thereafter until the sale of Commerce Park Building 3 is complete and a receiver has been appointed. The court ORDERS that the claims against Relief Defendants EDC I and EVF are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re Parties' 89 Joint Status Report: The court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report updating the court on the status of this matter on or before Monday, 6/15/2020. The court STRIKES the SEC's pending motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 74 ) without prejudice to refiling the motion in the event the parties are unable to resolve the underlying issues. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MW)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 86 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties request that the Court's Order setting an evidentiary hearingin this matter for March 23, 2020 be continued pending further developments withrespect to the matters set forth in the parties' joint letter to the Court of March 13, 2020. The parties request that they be allowed to update the Court on these developments with a Joint Status Report on April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SCHEDULING EVIDENTIARY HEARING re Plaintiff's 74 MOTION for Judgment: Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. The court further ORDERS the parties to exchange and file their respective witness and exhibit lists no later than Thursday, 3/19/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MW)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting relief in parties' 72 Joint Status Report. SEC's motion and supporting papers will be due 10/16/2019; Defendants' opposition will be due on 11/20/2019; and the SEC's reply will be due on 12/4/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re parties' 70 Joint Status Report. The parties are ordered to file another joint status report on September 27, 2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Joint Status Report. Parties shall file another Joint Status Report on 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER regarding parties' 64 Joint Status Report. Parties may file another Joint Status Report on 6/5/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER to amend complaint re parties' 58 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER STRIKING trial date scheduled for 3/4/2019; denying as moot parties' Motions in Limine (Dkts. 46 , 48 ). Updated Joint Status Report due within 10 days of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commissions voluntary dismissal of the remaining claims. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' and Relief Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff SEC's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Gregory N. Miller
Represented By: John D. Worland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shin Fong Chen
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Space Port International Group, Inc
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Foreign Trade Zone Industries, LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Economic Development Capital, LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Economic Development Capital II, LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVF, Inc
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Lake 96000 Building LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Basin Orchards, LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIA, LLC
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chen
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Chen
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Chen
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Chen
Represented By: Frank Raymond Siderius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?