Redweek, Inc v. Does et al

Plaintiff: Redweek, Inc
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and John Does 11-20
Case Number: 2:2017cv00429
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 21 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants; deadline extended to 9/15/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 14, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 8, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 13 Second Ex Parte Motion for expedited discovery by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 22, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 4 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Discovery, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (swt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redweek, Inc v. Does et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redweek, Inc
Represented By: Christian William Marcelo
Represented By: William C Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?