Lyall v. U S Bank National Assocation et al

Plaintiff: Marta D Lyall
Defendant: U S Bank National Assocation, Truman Title 2013 SC3 Title Trust, Truman Capital Advisors LP, Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC, Bank of America NA, Ditech Home Loan Servicing, CWABS Master Trust, Equity Loans Asset Backed Notes Series 2004-O, Carnegie Mellon University, University of Washington, Washington State Department of Commerce, Dispute Resolution Center of King County and John and Jane Does 1-100
Case Number: 2:2017cv00472
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 48:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 171 ORDER granting Defendant Weinstein and Riley, Foreclosure Trustee's 161 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 166 ORDER granting Defendants' 130 , 131 , 136 , 144 , 147 Motions to Dismiss signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 162 ORDER granting Defendants Rushmore Loan Management Services and US Bank National Association's 156 Motion for Entry of Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment for Defendants Rushmore and US Bank, signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 154 ORDER re Plaintiff's 149 Letter and 150 Letter. The Court permits Plaintiff to file one brief in opposition not to exceed forty-eight pages, addressing all pending motions to dismiss. In the alternative, Plaintiff may respond separately to each motion but will be limited to the twenty-four page limit. Plaintiff's first response to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 131 ) is due January 16, 2018. The Court will grant Plaintiff an extension to respond to all pending moti ons to dismiss. Plaintiff may file her response(s) no later than Monday, February 12, 2018. Defendants' replies must be filed no later than Friday, February 16, 2018. The Court directs the Clerk to re-note the pending motions for February 16, 20 18. Plaintiff's response(s) must abide by the page limits set forth above. The Court will not consider pages beyond these limits. The Court DENIES these requests to the extent that Plaintiff is seeking to pursue discovery and motion practice outside the normal course of litigation. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 122 ORDER granting Defendant Kim Turnow's 115 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Kim Turnow terminated. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 114 ORDER granting Defendant CW Title's 102 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 100 ORDER granting defendants' 87 Motion to Dismiss; directing the clerk to draw check from court registry; Within five (5) days from the date of this Order, Defendants shall provide the clerk with the mailing addresses, social security numbers, or tax identification numbers of the disbursement recipients signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) cc fin'l
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 94 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 91 ORDER granting defendant UW's 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER acknowledging plaintiff's untimely deposit of #1610.00 into the Court registry at 9:15am on 6/30/17; court instructs the clerk to set a date for a preliminary injunction hearing in this matter by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 81 ORDER This Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Letter to the Court requesting reconsideration 70 . Plaintiff states that she suffered injuries the day before her response to Defendant's motion was due and therefore could not complete her response in time. In light of plaintiff's condition, the court grants plaintiff's motion for relief 70 . The court directs the clerk to reinstate defendants' 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under FRCP 12(b)(6), or In The Alternative, for Summary Judgment Under FRCP 56, plaintiff's response due 7/6/17. Court will not consider any further extensions or requests for relief on this issue by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 77 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 75 Emergency Letter Requesting Reconsideration, by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER granting defendant UW's 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting plaintiff's 62 Motion for TRO. The parties must inform the Court immediately upon receipt of the Ninth Circuit's Order in the pending appeal. The TRO will be in effect until that time signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER re Plaintiff's 51 Letter to Court Seeking Permission to File Several Motions, by Judge Richard A Jones. (SWT)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 54 ORDER ON REVIEW OF REFUSAL TO RECUSE re 43 Motion for Recusal; The Court finds no evidence upon which to reasonably question Judge Jones's impartiality and AFFIRMS his denial of Plaintiff's request that he recuse himself signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 48 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SEEK PERMISSION BEFORE FILING ANY ADDITIONAL MOTIONS by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER granting plaintiff's 19 Motion to amend the complaint; the court now considers the amended complaint 16 to be the operative complaint signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 44 ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones declining to recuse from this case. Clerk is directed to refer Plaintiff's 43 Amended Emergency Motion for Recusal to Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for TRO signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER granting defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; plaintiff's request for an extension of time to respond to defendants' motion is denied; court reserves ruling on the motion to amend until the parties have had the chance to fully brief the issues signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER denying 2 MOTION for Emergency Ex Parte Temporary Injunction to Enjoin (Stop) Foreclosure Sale of Two Properties (same trustee) on 3/24/17, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyall v. U S Bank National Assocation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta D Lyall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Bank National Assocation
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Title 2013 SC3 Title Trust
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Capital Advisors LP
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services LLC
Represented By: Joshua Schaer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Home Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CWABS Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Loans Asset Backed Notes Series 2004-O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnegie Mellon University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Washington
Represented By: Seth J Berntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispute Resolution Center of King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?