LVB-Odgen Marketing Corporation v. Dean et al
Defendant: Bingo Investments, LLC, David Bingham, Sharon G Bingham, Christopher G Bingham, Cherish Bingham and Frances P Graham
Petitioner: LVB-Odgen Marketing Corporation
Respondent: Henry Dean and Park Place Motors Ltd
Case Number: 2:2017cv00528
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice per Plaintiff-Petitioner's 78 Notice of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER denying Respondent Henry Dean's 68 Motion to Stay or in the Alternative Motion for Protective Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Trustee's 55 Motion for Relief from Court Deadline; deadline imposed by the Court's Minute Order, dkt. 53 , is EXTENDED to 3/30/2018; parties are DIRECTED to confer in good faith prior to filing subsequent discovery motions. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part LVB-Ogden Marketing's 44 Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena to CCRB Enterprises, LLC; denying CCRB's request for sanction against LVB (dkt. 48 ). Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting LVB-Ogden Marketing's 25 Renewed Motion to Compel the SGB 2007 Trust to Produce Documents. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. On May 31, 2017, the Court entered two Orders, docket nos. 19 , 20 , granting in part and denying in part petitioner's motion to compel compliance with subpoenas, docket no. 1 . Three months have elapsed since the Court entered these Orders without further activity in this matter. Unless any party objects within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Minute Order, the Court will close the case. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part LVB's 1 MOTION to Compel compliance with LVB's subpoena to Park Place, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LVB-Odgen Marketing Corporation v. Dean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LVB-Odgen Marketing Corporation
Represented By: Seann C Colgan
Represented By: Jonathan J Faria(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: William Randolph Squires, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Dean
Represented By: Manish Borde
Represented By: Scott B Henrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Park Place Motors Ltd
Represented By: Manish Borde
Represented By: Scott B Henrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bingo Investments, LLC
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bingham
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon G Bingham
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher G Bingham
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherish Bingham
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances P Graham
Represented By: Emanuel Fraser Jacobowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?