Johnson v. MGM Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary L. Johnson
Defendant: MGM Holdings, Inc, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios, Inc, Twentieth Century Fox Home Entertainment, LLC, Twenty First Century Fox, Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv00541
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting plaintiff's 50 Unopposed MOTION for Final Approval of Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement and Final Certification of the Settlement Class; approving the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement; certifying settlement class; granting in part plaintiff's 51 Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Named Plaintiff Enhancement Award. This matter is now closed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 41 Amended Notice and Stipulation Regarding Deadlines ; All current deadlines in this matter are vacated. No later than January 31, 2018 either (1) Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Preliminary Approval, or (2) the parties shall file a Joint Report re Status of Settlement, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of Defendants Metro- Goldwyn-Mayer Home Entertainment, LLC, Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer, Inc., MGM Holdings, Inc and Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Home Entertainment Distribution Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CURRENT DEADLINES PENDING MEDIATION FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/1/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/14/2017, Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may amend her Complaint within 14 days of this Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 32 Stipulation to Continue deadlines : FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/11/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/18/2017, Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2017, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue deadlines re parties' 30 Stipulation ; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is EXTENDED to 7/31/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is EXTENDED to 8/7/2017, Combined Joint Status Report andDiscovery Plan deadline is EXTENDED to 8/14/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTING 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; Noting Date 5/26/2017, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. MGM Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Johnson
Represented By: Sylvie Derrien(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Alexander Sether Kleinberg
Represented By: Alan J. Statman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Samuel T. Boyd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios, Inc
Represented By: Samuel T. Boyd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox Home Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Samuel T. Boyd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twenty First Century Fox, Inc
Represented By: Samuel T. Boyd(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?