Davis et al v. Seva Beauty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anna A. Davis, Christiana Grace LLC, Punardeep Sandhu, Amarjeet Randhawa, Ryan Hollis, Jason Bleick, Karen Bleick, Beauty in Spokane LLC, Greg Kelly, Robin Kelly, Avatar2026 Holdings Inc, Thomas Cuthbert, Laura Charboneau, Midwest Beauty Inc, On Call Enterprises Inc, Mivas LLC and RS Spas & Salons LLC
Defendant: Seva Beauty LLC, Vasilios Maniatis, Sonal Maniatis, Kari Comrov, Bree Viscia and Jonathan Kittner
Case Number: 2:2017cv00547
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all remaining claims re parties' 57 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing certain claims re parties' 55 Stipulation; Plaintiffs Greg Kelly, Robin Kelly, and Avatar2026 Holdings, Inc. dismiss their claims against Defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC and Vasilios Maniatis with prejudice and without costs, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing certain claims re parties' 53 Stipulation. Plaintiff On Call Enterprises, Inc. dismisses its claims against Defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC and Vasilios Maniatis with prejudice and without costs, expenses, or attorney's fees awarded to any party. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(On Call Enterprises Inc. terminated.)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing certain claims re parties' 51 Stipulation; Plaintiff Mivas, LLC dismisses claims against defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC and Vasilios Maniatis without prejudice and without costs, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing certain claims re parties' 49 Stipulation. Plaintiffs Anna A. Davis and Christiana Grace, LLC dismiss their claims against Defendants SEVA Beauty, LLC and Vasilios Maniatis with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Christiana Grace LLC and Anna A. Davis terminated.)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 47 Joint Status Report. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file another Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after the conclusion of arbitration proceedings or by April 30, 2019, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing certain claims re parties' 45 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Plaintiffs Punardeep Sandhu; Amarjeet Randhawa; RS Spas and Salons, LLC; Ryan Hollis; Jason Bleick; Karen Bleick; Beauty In Spokane, LLC; and defendants Sonal Maniatis; Kari Comrov; Bree Viscia; and Jonathan Kittner terminated.)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 43 Motion for Partial Reconsideration, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting deferred portion of defendants' 17 Motion to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration; Case stayed pending further order of the court; Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after the conclusion of arbitration proceedings or by 7/31/2018, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER striking Plaintiffs' 40 Motion for Reconsideration as premature. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting in part, deferring in part and RENOTING Defendants' 17 Motion to Stay this Action Pending Arbitration : Noting date 8/11/2017, Joint Status Report due within fourteen (14) days after one or more of such arbitration proce edings conclude or by 1/15/2018 ; The hearing set for July 26, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., is STRICKEN ; striking as moot Defendants' 36 Motion to Continue the Hearing ; striking in part as moot and granting in part Defendants' 35 Motion to Stay Discovery ; striking as moot Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. nos. 28 and 29 . Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiffs' 31 Motion for Reconsideration ; setting Oral Argument on plaintiffs' 28 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 29 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2017 at 10:00 AM, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER RENOTING Plaintiff's 29 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Noting Date 7/21/2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Seva Beauty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna A. Davis
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Grace LLC
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punardeep Sandhu
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarjeet Randhawa
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hollis
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Bleick
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bleick
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beauty in Spokane LLC
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Kelly
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Kelly
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avatar2026 Holdings Inc
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cuthbert
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Charboneau
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Beauty Inc
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On Call Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mivas LLC
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RS Spas & Salons LLC
Represented By: Randall Paul Beighle
Represented By: Daniel Adam Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seva Beauty LLC
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasilios Maniatis
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonal Maniatis
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Comrov
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bree Viscia
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Kittner
Represented By: Frederic A Cohen(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John R Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?