Abuzeide v. Openroad Auto Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Abuzeide
Defendant: Openroad Auto Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00583
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting parties' 40 Stipulated Motion of Dismissal. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above-entitled case be dismissedwith prejudice and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: 38 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Trial & Pretrial Schedule; Bench Trial **4-5 Days** is set for 8/20/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez, Joinder of Parties due by 7/17/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2 017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a) (2) due by 2/5/2018, Discovery Motions due by 4/30/2018, Discovery completed by 5/15/2018, Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2018, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 6/1/2018, Motions in Limine due by 7/23/2018, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2018, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/15/2018, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/15/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE THE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY re: sale of Porsche 918 Spyder, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: financial deputy
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE SECOND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING; the court's in court deputy will contact parties to set new date and time; any supplemental briefing due by noon on 5/22/17 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Plaintiff's request for expedited discovery is denied. A Second Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 5/11/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez. Supplemental briefing due by noon on 5/8/2017. Plaintiff to certify with the Court by noon on 4/27/2017 that it has served this Order on Defendant. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part plaintiff's 8 Second Motion for TRO; Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S Martinez by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying plaintiff's 2 Motion for TRO by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abuzeide v. Openroad Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Abuzeide
Represented By: Michael E McAleenan
Represented By: Matthew C Niemela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Openroad Auto Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jehiel I Baer
Represented By: Avi J. Lipman
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?