Bolding et al v. Banner Bank
Plaintiff: Kelly Bolding and Michael Manfredi
Defendant: Banner Bank
Case Number: 2:2017cv00601
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER re Parties' 367 Stipulated Motion to Stay. This action is stayed until 3/6/2023. The trial date and pretrial deadlines shall be reset if the parties' settlement efforts do not succeed. The stay shall be automatically lifted on 3/6/2023, unless there is good cause to lift it sooner. Within ten days after expiration of the stay set forth above, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER re Parties' 365 Stipulated Motion to Continue Stay. The stay shall be automatically lifted on January 9, 2023, unless there is good cause to lift it sooner. Within ten days after expiration of the stay set forth above, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report that includes new proposed trial date and pretrial deadlines if the parties' settlement efforts do not succeed. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER re Parties' 360 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Temporarily Staying Proceedings and Vacating Case Schedule Pending Mediation. This action is stayed until September 30, 2022. Within ten days after expiration of the stay, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER denying Defendant's 345 Motion for Default Judgment AGAINST OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS BRANDT, GARRISON, KEENAN, SLOCUM, LALONDE, ERCHINGER, FERRY, GUBARIK FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 298 Motion to Bifurcate Trial Into Liability and Damages. The first phase of the trial will adjudicate defendant's liability and the individual damages of all plaintiffs, class me mbers, and collective members who testify during that phase. The second phase of the trial, if necessary, will resolve the individual damages of all other plaintiffs, class members, and collective members. Plaintiffs' requests for additional notice and motions practice are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER GRANTING 270 LEAVE TO DEPOSE CLASS MEMBERS MATTHEW TOWERY AND ROBERTA BANEGAS AND FOR RELATED EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SR)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER denying Defendant's 268 Sealed Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 264 Motion to Seal. Defendant shall file redacted versions of the memoranda and exhibits for public viewing. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 227 Motion for Protective Order REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OPT-IN DISCOVERY REQUESTS. Banner Bank's request for a protective order is GRANTED as to Interrogatory Nos. 10-13 and 15 and DENIED as to its objection regarding the number of discrete subparts. Defendant shall, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, supplement its response to Interrogatory No. 14. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 232 Motion to Certify Additional Claims and Include in Certified Rule 23 Class. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting 328 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court vacates the trial date and remaining case deadlines, as currently set forth in the Amended Order Setting Trial Date & Related Case Deadlines (Dkt. 205). Within ten business days following the Court's ruling on all pending motions (Dkts. 227, 231, 232, 237, 264, 266, 270, 277, 294, 298, 300, 311), the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report that includes new proposed dates for trial and remaining case deadlines. (KERR)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 305 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting Defendant's 262 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting Defendant's 244 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER re Parties' 229 STIPULATION RE-NOTING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT BANNER BANK'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' OPT-IN DISCOVERY REQUESTS. Defendant's 227 Motion is re-noted to 9/18/2020; Plaintiffs' response to the Motion is due on 9/11/2020; and Defendant's reply is due on 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S 189 MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF FEE AGREEMENTS. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 198 MOTION for Protective Order. Defendant shall not issue a third-party subpoena or otherwise seek discovery regarding Ms. Bolding's or Ms. Taylor's timekeeping records from their current employers. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting Defendant's 214 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying Defendant's 212 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER regarding Plaintiffs' 166 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER re the parties' 164 Stipulated MOTION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. (KERR)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting Parties' 162 Stipulated Motion Continuing Stay of Case: The stay in this action is extended until 12/2/2019, including all formal discovery. Within ten business days after expiration of the stay set forth above, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report that includes new proposed case deadlines including a trial date if the parties' settlement efforts do not succeed. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re Parties' 159 Stipulated Motion Extending Stay: This action is stayed until 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER temporarily staying proceedings and vacating case schedule pending mediation re parties' 153 Stipulated Motion: Joint Status Report due within ten days after expiration of the stay, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying defendant Banner Bank's 138 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER for Further Briefing re Defendant's 138 MOTION for Reconsideration re 135 Order on Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiffs may, if they choose, file a response to the motion for reconsideration on or before November 13, 2018. Defend ant's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than November 16th. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-note defendant's "Motion for Partial Reconsideration" (Dkt. # 138 ) on the Court's calendar for November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 99 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' 98 Motion to Seal Exhibits Q and Z to the Declaration of Charlotte Sanders in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Exhibit Q (Dkt. # 101 ) by agreement of the parties. Exhibit Z (Dkt. # 106 ) is part of a confidential mediation statement and will remain sealed. Defendant's request to strike Dkt. # 106 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 71 Motion to Certify Class; granting plaintiffs' 115 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record; directing the Clerk of Court to seal Dkt. 90 . Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 95 Stipulated MOTION for a Protective Order signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting plaintiffs' 73 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall, within seven days of the date of this Order, file and serve the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting plaintiff's 70 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Motion for Class Certification, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Seal signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTING plaintiffs' 16 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Motion for Collective Action Certification Under 29 USC 216(b) and to Send Notice to the Class ; Noting Date 9/1/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolding et al v. Banner Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Bolding
Represented By: Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship
Represented By: Robin J Shishido
Represented By: Jordan A Taren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Manfredi
Represented By: Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship
Represented By: Robin J Shishido
Represented By: Jordan A Taren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Bank
Represented By: Ryan Coby Hess
Represented By: Kenneth E Payson
Represented By: Sheehan H Sullivan Weiss
Represented By: Laura-Lee S Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?