Gonzalez Figueroa v. Wilcox et al
Petitioner: Jesus O Gonzalez Figueroa
Respondent: Bryan S. Wilcox, David D Rivera, Thomas D Homan, Juan P Osuna, John F Kelly, Jefferson Sessions and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00603
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: James P. Donohue
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge James L. Robart. The court OVERRULES Mr. Gonzalez Figueroa's objections (Dkt. # 13 ) and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. # 12 ). Respondents' motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 3 ) is G RANTED in part, and this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the District of Alabama by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (PM)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. Petitioner's response is due July 10, 2017. Respondents' reply is due July 21, 2017. Clerk is directed to RE-NOTE respondents' motion to dismiss, Dkt. 3, for July 21, 2017.(ST)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT, § 2241 PETITION by Hon. James P. Donohue. Electronic posting of this Order shall affect service upon the United States Attorney. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall show cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted by filing a return. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note it for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply brief not later than the Friday designated for consideration of the matter.(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez Figueroa v. Wilcox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus O Gonzalez Figueroa
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Represented By: Minda Thorward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S. Wilcox
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David D Rivera
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas D Homan
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Juan P Osuna
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John F Kelly
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson Sessions
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?