Smith v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Matthew David Smith
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv00647
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Whatcom
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend Order for Attorney's Fees: Plaintiff's attorney Amy Gilbrough is allowed an attorney fee of $6,686.23, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Attorney Fees: Plaintiff's attorney Amy Gilbrough is allowed an attorney fee of $17,642.25 pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Plaintiff's attorney received fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act of $13,724.48. The net fee owed is $3,917.77. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re parties' 16 Stipulated Motion to Remand. It is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned case be REMANDED for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying the Commisioner's 5 Motion to Dismiss. The Commissioner is further directed to file an answer on or before April 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Dismiss is due December 11, 2017. Any reply is due December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones.(TH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Dismiss is due December 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (TH)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Dismiss due 11/6/2017; Reply (if any) due 11/10/2017. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew David Smith
Represented By: Amy Gilbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?