Anderson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: David Alan Anderson
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00659
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re 15 Notice of Settlement. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a stipulated dismissal or voluntary dismissal within 60 days from the issuance of this order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting parties' 11 Joint Motion to Seal Administrative Record. The Clerk is DIRECTED to maintain the administrative record under seal during the pendency of this case. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 11 Joint Motion to Seal the Administrative Record. The parties are ORDERED to file a copy of the administrative record no later than February 5, 2018. The administrative record may be filed under seal for purposes of the Court's in camera review. The administrative record will be maintained under seal until such time as the Court issues an order on the parties' stipulated motion to seal (Dkt. No. 11 ). Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 9 Stipulated MOTION Setting Deadlines. Defendant to produce administrative record to Plaintiff and join all parties by 10/13/2017, Defendant to file administrative record with the Court by 2/1/2018, Parties to exchange FRCP 52 motions for trial on the administrative record by 2/16/2018, Parties to exchange response memorandums 3/16/2018, Parties to exchange reply memorandums by 3/30/2018, All trial-related filings to be filed with Court by 4/2/2018, and Non-jury trial date set for 4/30/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alan Anderson
Represented By: Christopher E Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephania Camp Denton
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?