United States of America v. Allahyari et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Komron M. Allahyari, Leslie R. Allahyari, Shaun Allahyari and King County
Case Number: 2:2017cv00668
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting United States' 147 Motion for an Installment Payment Order: Komron M. Allahyari shall make regular installment payments of $4,500 per month to the United States Department of Justice in payment towards the judgment lia bility in this matter. Payment shall commence on 3/16/2020, and each month thereafter on the 15th of each subsequent month; Within seven days of the entry of this Order, Komron M. Allahyari will take the steps necessary to arrange for these installment payments to be made via ACH debiting, consistent with instructions from the Department of Justice, Tax Division's Financial Litigation Unit. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)(cc: Defendant Komron M Allahyari via USPS)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER: The start time of oral argument on the Government's motion for Installment Payment Order, docket no. 147 , on Tuesday, 2/11/2020, is RESET to 9:00 AM. The Court anticipates that the hearing will take 3-4 hours. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff United States of America and Defendant Komron M. Allahyari are DIRECTED, on or before 2/6/2020, to file a list of witnesses to be called, indicating how long each will testify, and exhibits to be offered at the February 11 , 2020, evidentiary hearing. On or before 2/6/2020, each party shall also provide two sets of exhibits, appropriately tabbed and bound in three-ring binders. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be numbered consecutively beginning with 1; Defendant 9;s exhibits shall be numbered consecutively beginning with the next multiple of 100 after Plaintiff's last exhibit. For example, if Plaintiff's last exhibit is numbered 159, then Defendant's exhibits shall begin with the number 200. Counsel shall coordinate with Gail Glass at (206) 370-8522 concerning the delivery of exhibit notebooks. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant Komron M Allahyari via USPS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER: Government's 147 MOTION for Installment Payment Order is SET for hearing on 2/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15206 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Plaintiff's motion is RENOTED to the date of the hearing. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (cc: Defendant Komron M Allahyari via USPS)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER denying defendant Shaun Allahyari's 133 Motion to Quash and for Other Relief; denying non-party Jamie Olander's 137 Joinder in Shaun Allahyari's Motion to Quash. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 128 Motion to Post Security. The 101 Judgment and 102 Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale shall be stayed only upon Defendant Shaun Allahyari's posting of a supersedeas bond in the amount of $500,000. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER granting in Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 122 Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal. The Court ORDERS that the 101 Judgment and 102 Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale be stayed upon Defendant Shaun Allahyari's posting of a supersedeas bond or other security in the amount of $500,000. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER striking as moot, without prejudice, defendant Shaun Allahyari's 104 Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting parties' 111 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John Kaplan allowed to withdraw as counsel for defendant Shaun Allahyari and Avi Lipman shall continue as counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney John Stuart Kaplan terminated) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; directing the United States to file a proposed final judgment and proposed order for judicial sale within seven (7) days of Entry of these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allayari via USPS)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER denying defendant Shaun Allahyari's 91 Motion for Leave to File Short Post-Trial Brief. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allayari via USPS)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER further deferring in part and denying in part plaintiff's 66 , 69 -1, 78 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Plaintiff shall file a copy of the transcript of Ms. West's telephonic deposition on or before 8/29/2018. (See Minute Order for further details.) Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff's trial exhibits to be numbered 1 thorugh 99, and defendant's trial exhibits to be numbered beginning with 101; parties shall provide to chambers a set of trial exhibits on or before 8/22/2018; counsel shal l confer or submit a joint statement or revised motions in limine on or before 8/22/2018; granting in part and deferring in part plaintiff's 66 Motion in Limine; denying defendant Shaun Allahyari's 67 Motion in Limine. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER striking in part as moot and otherwise denying the Government's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 51 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment. The Pretrial Conference is RESCHEDULED from 8/24/2018, to 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) Modified on 7/30/2018: copy sent to Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail (PM).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PARTIAL JUDGMENT re parties' 49 Stipulated Motion; entered against defendant Komron Allahyari in favor of the United States of America in the following amounts: $2,859,853.75 on First Claim For Relief, $614,755.49 on the Second Claim For Relief, $435,861.11 on the Third Claim For Relief. (See Judgment for details). Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (cc: Komron Allahyari via USPS)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER setting oral argument on the United States' 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Defendant Shaun Allahyari's 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 7/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) cc: Defendant Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulation and Order for Substitution of Counsel. Diane E. Tebelius and Sandra Veliz of LeSourd & Patten, P.S. are GRANTED leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Shaun Allahyari, effective immediat ely, and John S. Kaplan of Perkins Coie LLP is substituted as counsel of record for Shaun Allahyari. Defendant Komron M. Allahyari's unopposed motion, docket no. 40 , to permit counsel to withdraw is GRANTED as follows. Diane E. Tebelius and Sa ndra Veliz of LeSourd & Patten, P.S. are granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record for Komron M. Allahyari, effective immediately. Defendant Komron M. Allahyari is allowed to proceed pro se. He is hereby REMINDED that he has an obligation to kee p the Court apprised of his contact information and to provide the Court with any changes of address. Defendant pro se is also ADVISED that he is expected to comply with the rules and orders of this Court and that he will be held to the same standards as lawyers authorized to practice before this Court. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH) (cc: Defendant Komron M. Allahyari via first class mail)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER of Dismissal of Leslie Cover re parties' 32 Stipulation, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Leslie R Cover terminated.)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend Complaint. The United States shall file its First Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this minute order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of dismissal of King County re parties' 17 Stipulated Motion; signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (King County terminated.)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed 12 motion to amend case caption to reflect a name change of defendant Leslie R. Allahyari to Leslie R. Cover. Authorized signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Allahyari et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komron M. Allahyari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie R. Allahyari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Allahyari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Margaret A Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?