Del Rio et al v. Ipeco Holdings, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Lourdes Del Rio, Jorge Calero, Deborah Aitken, Brent Fleming, Rebecca Koskela, Steve Koskela, Mary Ellen Nowobilski, John Nowobilski and Carlos Ulloa
Defendant: Ipeco Holdings, Ltd., The Boeing Company and Does 1-40
Case Number: 2:2017cv00690
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 88 Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Remaining Deadlines. The Court ENTERS the following amended scheduling order: 15-DAY ESTIMATE Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U. S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 4/28/2020, Defendants' expert disclosures due by 5/28/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 6/29/2020, Mediation deadline is 7/20/2020, Discovery comp leted by 9/29/2020, Dispositive motions due by 10/28/2020, Plaintiffs' Pretrial Statement due by 1/8/2021, Defendants' Pretrial Statement due by 1/18/2021, Review of exhibits/lists re: admissibility by 1/19-26/2021, Conference of Atto rneys completed by 2/1/2021, Deadline for mandatory courtroom technology training is 2/16/2021, Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2021, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/19/2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SWT)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed 86 Motion to substitute a proper party. Liana M. Murphy shall be substituted, as Executrix of the Estate of Lourdes A. Del Rio, as Intervenor in this case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Plaintiff Lourdes A. Del Rio from this matter. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 83 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 9/23/2019, Defendants' expert disclosures due by 10/23/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/15/2019, 39.1 me diation to be completed by 12/9/2019, Discovery completed by 2/18/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/18/2020, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 4/27/2020, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 5/6/2020, Conference of Attorneys completed by 5/18/ 2020, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2020, Deadline for mandatory courtroom technology training is 6/1/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/3/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/3/2020, Jury Trial is set for 7/13/2020 at 9:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 81 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 7/1/2019, Defendants' expert disclosures due by 8/1/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/26/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/23/2019, Discovery completed by 12/4/2019, Dispositive motions due by 1/3/2020, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 2/10/2020, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 2/21/2020, Conference of Attorneys c ompleted by 3/2/2020, Pretrial Order due by 3/16/2020, Deadline for mandatory courtroom technology training 3/16/2020, Trial briefs, proposed voir, proposed jury instructions, and motions in limine filed by 3/20/2020, Responses to motions in limine due by 4/10/2020, Jury Trial is set for 4/20/2020 at 09:30 AM. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 78 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The Case ENTERS the following amended scheduling order: Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by March 1, 2019; Defendants' expert disclosures due by April 1, 20 19; Parties' rebuttal expert disclosures due by April 26, 2019; Mediation deadline - May 24, 2019; Close of discovery - August 4, 2019; Dispositive motion deadline - September 3, 2019; Plaintiffs' pretrial statement due by October 2, 2 019; Defendants' pretrial statement due by October 14, 2019; Deadline for conference of attorneys - October 22, 2019; Pretrial order filed by November 1, 2019; Deadline for mandatory courtroom technology training - November 2, 2019; Trial b riefs, proposed voir, proposed jury instructions, and motions in limine filed by November 4, 2019; Responses to motions in limine due by November 18, 2019; Trial (15-day estimate) - December 2, 2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 76 Stipulation signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING Defendant Ipeco Holdings Ltd.'s 66 Motion to Dismiss and DENYING Plaintiffs' 67 motion for attorney fees. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to provide the Court with a courtesy of copy of their response to Defendant Ipeco Holdings, LTD.'s motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 67 ). The courtesy copy shall include the response brief as well as all attachments. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to submit the courtesy copy to the Clerk of Court, attention Judge Coughenour, no later than January 19, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Rio et al v. Ipeco Holdings, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lourdes Del Rio
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Calero
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Aitken
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Fleming
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Koskela
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Koskela
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Nowobilski
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nowobilski
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ulloa
Represented By: Brett Scott Bustamante
Represented By: Michael David Myers
Represented By: F. Phillip Peche(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipeco Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Telly Andrews(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Casey Bruner
Represented By: Michael Cutler
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Represented By: Marnie A. Holz(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Richard A. Lazenby
Represented By: Marissa Nicole Lefland
Represented By: Richard A. Walker(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Rachel Constantino-Wallace
Represented By: Todd W Rosencrans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?